EP2175412 - Promotional material playback upon trigger event [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For all designated states SONY ELECTRONICS, INC. Sony Drive Park Ridge New Jersey 07656 / US | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carpio, Frederik 10312 Reserve Drive 310 San Diego California 92127 / US | 02 /
Frazier, Milton Massey 1035 Tesoro Avenue San Marcos California 92069 / US | 03 /
Georgis, Nikolaos 11621 Windcrest Lane San Diego California 92128 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | McGowan, Cathrine, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Scaddan, Gareth Casey, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252146.7 | 08.09.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20080246845 | 07.10.2008 Original published format: US 246845 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175412 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Werbematerialwiedergabe bei Auslöserereignis | [2010/15] | English: | Promotional material playback upon trigger event | [2010/15] | French: | Lecture de matériel publicitaire sur événement déclencheur | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 11.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 08.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/13] | 31.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-14 | Examination | WO2005034471 | US2007118728 | US2007287437 |