EP2172960 - Chromatic aberration corrector for charded particle beam system and correction method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JEOL LTD. 1-2, Musashino 3-chome Akishima Tokyo 196-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states JEOL Ltd. 1-2, Musashino 3-chome Akishima Tokyo 196-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Hidetaka 1-8-1, Kashiwa-cho Tachikawa Tokyo, 109-0004 / JP | 02 /
Hosokawa, Fumio 3-6-10-1102, Tsutsujigaoka Akishima Tokyo, 196-0012 / JP | [2013/07] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
Sawada, Hidetaka 1-8-1, Kashiwa-cho Tachikawa Tokyo, 109-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
Hosokawa, Fumio 3-6-10-1102, Tsutsujigaoka Akishima Tokyo, 196-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/07] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/14] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252365.3 | 06.10.2009 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | JP20080259915 | 06.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008259915 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2172960 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2172960 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2172960 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/153, H01J37/145 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H01J37/153 (EP,US);
H01J37/145 (EP,US);
H01J2237/1516 (EP,US);
H01J2237/1534 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | Korrektor von chromatischen Aberrationen für Ladungsträgerstrahlsystem und Korrekturverfahren dafür | [2010/14] | English: | Chromatic aberration corrector for charded particle beam system and correction method therefor | [2010/14] | French: | Correcteur d'aberrations chromatiques pour système de faisceaux de particules chargées et procédé de correction correspondant | [2010/14] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 17.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2009 | AT | 13.02.2013 | BE | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | HR | 13.02.2013 | IT | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | MK | 13.02.2013 | MT | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | SM | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | NO | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | ES | 24.05.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | IE | 06.10.2013 | LU | 06.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 06.10.2009 | |
AT | 13.02.2013 | ||
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MK | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 06.10.2013 | ||
LU | 06.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MK | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 06.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 06.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 06.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 06.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
NO | 13.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003034457 (ROSE HARALD [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005353429 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]US2005104006 (YOSHIDA TAKAHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * table 1 * * paragraphs [0049] - [0054] * | by applicant | JP2003203593 | - O. SCHERZER, OPTIK, (1947), vol. 2, pages 114 - 132 | - H. ROSE, OPTIK, (1990), vol. 85, pages 19 - 24 |