EP2241984 - File control system and file control computer for use in said system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akagawa, Etsutaro c/o Hitachi Ltd. IP Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Akira c/o Hitachi Ltd. IP Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252525.2 | 30.10.2009 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | JP20090097354 | 13.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009097354 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2241984 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
G06F16/1827 (EP,US);
G06F3/0605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dateikontrollsystem und Dateikontrollcomputer zur Verwendung in dem System | [2010/42] | English: | File control system and file control computer for use in said system | [2010/42] | French: | Système de contrôle de fichiers et ordinateur de contrôle de fichiers pour utiliser avec ledit système | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002133539 (MONDAY PAUL R [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] *; | [XI]US2005066076 (BEST STEVEN FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 2-10; | [A]US2007220071 (ANZAI TOMOYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] ** paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072] * | Examination | US2006031631 | by applicant | US2002133539 | JP2004342050 | JP2005011316 | US2005066076 | JP2005292952 | US2007220071 | JP2009097354 | - W. CURTIS PRESTON, SAN & NAS STORAGE NETWORK MANAGEMENT, (20021030), page 108 |