EP2184529 - Retrofit apparatus and method for gas line moisture detection and removal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telematics Wireless Ltd. 26 Hamelacha St. 58117 Holon / IL | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kafri, Eddy Saknay 10 Hod Hasharon / IL | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252567.4 | 06.11.2009 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | US20080111902P | 06.11.2008 Original published format: US 111902 P | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2184529 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2184529 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F17D3/14 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
F17D3/145 (EP,US);
G01F23/241 (EP,US);
G01F23/804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nachrüstungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erkennen und Abziehen von Feuchtigkeit in einer Gasleitung | [2010/19] | English: | Retrofit apparatus and method for gas line moisture detection and removal | [2010/19] | French: | Appareil de réajustement et procédé pour détection et élimination de l'humidité dans un circuit de gaz | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003194612 (TOHO GAS KK, et al) [Y] 1,2,5-13 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2166870 (LOIACONO DOMINIC N) [Y] 1,2,5-13 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000291900 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1,2,5,10 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6136600 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5,7,8,11,12 * abstract *; | [A]GB2263325 (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 3; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US4921129 (JONES K TOM [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * line 37 - column 6, line 45; figure - * |