EP2194581 - Heat-dissipating silicone grease compositon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Kazutoshi c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showamachi, Kariyashi Aichi / JP | 02 /
Kizaki, Hiroaki c/o Silicone Electronic Material Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuidamachi, Annaka-shi Gunma, 379-0224 / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Kunihiro c/o Silicone Electronic Material Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuidamachi, Annaka-shi Gunma, 379-0224 / JP | 04 /
Uchida, Osamu c/o Silicone Electronic Material Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi, Matsuidamachi, Annaka-shi Gunma, 379-0224 / JP | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09252678.9 | 25.11.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | JP20080300437 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008300437 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2194581 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/12 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
C10M169/02 (EP,US);
C10M119/30 (KR);
C10M2201/056 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0626 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0415 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0445 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0465 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10N2020/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (KR);
C10N2030/08 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/68 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmeableitende Silikonfettzusammensetzung | [2010/23] | English: | Heat-dissipating silicone grease compositon | [2010/23] | French: | Composition de graisse de silicone dissipant la chaleur | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/46] | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007241303 (ZHONG HONG [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 97] , [ 110] , [0111] , [0000] , [0114]; claim 25; table 1 *; | [X]EP1985691 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052]; example 6; claim 1; table 1 *; | [X]EP0896031 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0075]; claim 1; table 1 * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0096] *; | [X]EP1600494 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-5; claims 1,2; table 1 *; | [X]EP1754772 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0103]; claims 1,7; table 2 * | by applicant | JPS5233272 | JPS5952195 | JPS52125506 | JPS5736302 | JPS6243492 | JPH02212556 | JPH03162493 | JP2003301189 |