EP2224611 - Compensation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium Limited Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire, SG1 2AS / GB | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Anna Olivia, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Johansson, Anna Olivia, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09275010.8 | 27.02.2009 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2224611 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H04B7/185 (EP,US);
H04B7/18543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kompensierungsvorrichtung | [2010/35] | English: | Compensation apparatus | [2010/35] | French: | Appareil de compensation | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2011/10] | 27.09.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5379445 (ARNSTEIN DONALD S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 57 - line 65 * * figure 2A *; | [A]GB2353159 (ICO SERVICES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 19, line 1 - line 8 ** figure 5 * |