EP2299339 - Compensating for hysteresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Michael Andrew BAE Systems plc Group Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2011/12] | Application number, filing date | 09275080.1 | 16.09.2009 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299339 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B17/02 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
G05B17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hystereseausgleich | [2011/12] | English: | Compensating for hysteresis | [2011/12] | French: | Compensation d'hystérèse | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/07] | 10.04.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009071898 (CAMBRIDGE MECHATRONICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 13 * * page 29, line 13 - page 30, line 21 * [A] 2-11; | [XA]DE19923462 (PHYSIK INSTR PI GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 5 * [A] 2-12 | [XA] - RU C ET AL, "A hysteresis compensation method of piezoelectric actuator: Model, identification and control", CONTROL ENGINEERING PRACTICE, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 17, no. 9, ISSN 0967-0661, (20090901), pages 1107 - 1114, (20090618), XP026351169 [X] 1-3,12-15 * page 1108 - page 1110 * * figures 4-7 * [A] 4-12 |