EP2112003 - Tire rubber composition with improved wet traction properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/44] | Tire rubber composition with improved wet traction properties | ||
[2015/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kumho Tire Co., Inc. 555, Sochon-dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju 506-711 / KR | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Young Deuck Unit 303-1003, 1Cha, Hyundai Apt. Jinwol-dong, Nam-gu Gwangju 503-769 / KR | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Lee, Young Deuck Unit 303-1003, 1Cha, Hyundai Apt. Jinwol-dong, Nam-gu Gwangju 503-769 / KR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Gevers & Orès 36 rue de Saint-Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/44] | Noel, Chantal Odile, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09290303.8 | 24.04.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | KR20080039011 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: KR 20080039011 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112003 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2112003 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L21/00, C08L93/00, C08K3/34, C08K5/101, C08K5/103 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
C08K5/103 (EP,KR);
C08L91/00 (EP,KR);
B60C1/0016 (EP,KR);
C08K3/346 (EP,KR);
C08K3/36 (EP,KR);
C08K5/0016 (EP,KR);
C08K5/101 (EP,KR);
C08L21/00 (EP,KR);
C08L9/06 (EP,KR);
C08L93/04 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/346, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K3/346, C08L93/00 (EP);
C08K5/0016, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/101, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/103, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2009/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reifengummizusammensetzung mit verbesserten Nasstraktionseigenschaften | [2015/39] | English: | Tire rubber composition with improved wet traction properties | [2015/39] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc pour pneu dotée de propriétés de traction mouillée améliorées | [2015/39] |
Former [2009/44] | Reifengummizusammensetzung mit verbesserten Nasstraktionseigenschaften | ||
Former [2009/44] | Tire rubber composition with improved wet traction properties | ||
Former [2009/44] | Composition de caoutchouc pour pneu dotée de propriétés de traction mouillée améliorées | Examination procedure | 19.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2009 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | IE | 24.04.2016 | LU | 24.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | GB | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.04.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.04.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.04.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 24.04.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GB | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 24.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH01215838 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1,5,7-10 * abstract * [Y] 6; | [YA]US2004127617 (VASSEUR DIDIER [FR], et al) [Y] 6 * page 2, paragraphs 34-36 * * page 3, paragraph 69 - page 4, paragraph 79 * [A] 2-4; | [A]JP2006152021 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5761072 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | KR20050002643 |