EP2259464 - Method and equipment for adjusting power amplification in an optical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt B.P. 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt Boîte Postale 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Inria Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt Boîte Postale 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Inria Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt Boîte Postale 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peloso, Pier Alcatel Lucent Bell labs France Centre de Villarceeaux-Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | 02 /
Fabre, Eric 15, cours Raphaël Binet 35000 Rennes / FR | 03 /
Pecci, Pascal Alcatel Lucent Bell labs France Centre de Villarceeaux-Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Peloso, Pier Alcatel Lucent Bell labs France Centre de Villarceeaux-Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | ||
02 /
Fabre, Eric 15, cours Raphaël Binet 35000 Rennes / FR | |||
03 /
Pecci, Pascal Alcatel Lucent Bell labs France Centre de Villarceeaux-Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | Representative(s) | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob, et al Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob, et al Cabinet Innovincia 11, Avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 09290408.5 | 02.06.2009 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2259464 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2259464 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H04J14/0221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Einstellung der Leistungsverstärkung in einem optischen Netzwerk | [2010/49] | English: | Method and equipment for adjusting power amplification in an optical network | [2010/49] | French: | Procédé et équipement pour ajuster l'amplification de puissance dans un réseau optique | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2009 | AT | 03.04.2013 | BE | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | IT | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MK | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | IE | 02.06.2013 | LU | 02.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MK | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 02.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 02.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 02.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004208531 (BOSLOY JONATHAN L [CA], et al) [X] 1-20 * column A * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063] * |