EP2294929 - Method for treating honey to obtain liquid, clear honey [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apinov 40 Rue de Chef de Baie Pöke Technologique 17000 La Rochelle / FR | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benjamin Poirot 14, bis, rue Bourg Chapon 85450 Champagne les marais / FR | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Marcadé, Véronique, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Marcadé, Véronique, et al Cabinet Ores 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09290700.5 | 14.09.2009 | [2011/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2294929 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/08 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
A23L21/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Honig, um einen flüssigen und klaren Honig zu erhalten | [2011/11] | English: | Method for treating honey to obtain liquid, clear honey | [2011/11] | French: | Procede de traitement du miel pour obtenir un miel liquide et limpide | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 25.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5468513 (FACKRELL ROBERT N [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US2005266135 (SILVER BARNARD S [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN1709159 (GUI JINHUA [CN]) [X] 1-5,14 * abstract * [I] 6-13 | by applicant | FR2732192 | JP2607604B | GB2435391 |