EP2168867 - Telescopic actuator with a main rod and an auxiliary rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charuel, Hervé 29 rue des frères Lumiere 91620 Nozay / FR | 02 /
Bucheton, Daniel 3 Square Clément Marot Résidence George V 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 03 /
Nierlich, Florent 12 rue de Plaisance 92250 Lagarenne-Colombes / FR | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
Charuel, Hervé 29 rue des frères Lumiere 91620 Nozay / FR | ||
02 /
Bucheton, Daniel 3 Square Clément Marot Résidence George V 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | |||
03 /
Nierlich, Florent 12 rue de Plaisance 92250 Lagarenne-Colombes / FR | |||
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Charuel, Hervé 29 rue des frères Lumiere 91620 Nozay / FR | ||
02 /
Bucheton, Daniel 3 Square Clément Marot Résidence George V 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | |||
03 /
Nierlich, Florent 14 rue Armand Silvestre 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Representative(s) | Parzy, Benjamin Alain, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Parzy, Benjamin Alain, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/13] | Parzy, Benjamin Alain, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09290711.2 | 18.09.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | FR20080005272 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: FR 0805272 | [2010/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2168867 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2168867 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/24, B64C13/28, B64C25/24, B64C13/50 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
B64C13/30 (EP,US);
F16H25/205 (EP,US);
F16H25/2454 (EP,US);
F16H2025/2059 (EP,US);
F16H2025/2075 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18672 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | B64C13/28, B64C25/24, B64C13/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Teleskopischer Stellantrieb mit Haupt- und Hilfstriebstange | [2012/01] | English: | Telescopic actuator with a main rod and an auxiliary rod | [2010/13] | French: | Actionneur télescopique à tige principale et à tige auxiliaire | [2010/13] |
Former [2010/13] | Teleskopischer Stellantrieb mit Haupt- und Hilstriebstange | Examination procedure | 02.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | HR | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | MK | 13.06.2012 | MT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | SM | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | NO | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | IE | 18.09.2012 | LU | 18.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
LU | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
LU | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | |
NO | 13.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR951949 (AUXILIAIRE IND L) [A] 1* figures 4-7 *; | [DX]FR2895483 (MESSIER BUGATTI SA [FR]) [DX] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | FR2895483 |