EP2337066 - Method for making a semiconductor device by laser irradiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Excico France 13-21 Quai des Gresillons, Bat. B7 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rack, Simon Avenue de la Résistance 39 1340 Ottignies / BE | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | BiiP bv Engels Plein 3 bus 102 3000 Leuven / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | BiiP cvba Culliganlaan 1B 1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE | Application number, filing date | 09290949.8 | 15.12.2009 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337066 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H01L22/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02098 (KR);
H01L21/268 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67253 (KR);
H01L22/12 (KR);
Y02P80/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleitervorrichtung mittels Laserbestrahlung | [2011/25] | English: | Method for making a semiconductor device by laser irradiation | [2011/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif semi-conducteur par irradiation laser | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/28] | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6469284 (MIHIRA JUN [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 3; figures 3,4 * * column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 48 - line 53 *; | [XA]US6656749 (PATON ERIC N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,11 * column 7, line 52 - line 56; figures 2,3 * * column 2, line 58 - line 61 * * column 3, line 26 - line 29 * [A] 6; | [YD]US2004115931 (LIU MARK Y [US], et al) [YD] 1-13* paragraphs [0008] , [0015] *; | [XI]US2005192700 (HOLFELD ANDRE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053]; figures 1,4 * [I] 11-13; | [XI]US2008248601 (TSUKAMOTO AKIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0029]; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [I] 4,5 | by applicant | US2004115931 |