EP2214432 - A method for assignment of resources from a pool of resources from to cells or sectors of a communication network, a base station and a communcation network therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karla, Ingo Buschkamp 8 46514, Schermbeck / DE | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Kleinbub, Oliver, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/31] | Application number, filing date | 09305078.9 | 29.01.2009 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2214432 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/10 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
H04W16/10 (EP);
H04W24/00 (EP);
H04W28/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/15] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zuweisung von Ressourcen aus einer Ressourcensammlung an Zellen oder Abschnitte eines Kommunikationsnetzwerks, Basisstation und Kommunikationsnetzwerk dafür | [2010/31] | English: | A method for assignment of resources from a pool of resources from to cells or sectors of a communication network, a base station and a communcation network therefor | [2010/31] | French: | Procédé d'affectation de ressources à partir d'un ensemble de ressources pour des cellules ou des secteurs d'un réseau de communications, station de base et réseau de communications correspondant | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006094370 (NGUYEN HIEN [US]) [Y] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0050] *; | [Y]WO2008007375 (DESIGNART NETWORKS LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-15 * page 2, line 24 - page 6, line 6 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 24 * * page 12, line 9 - line 29 * * page 14, line 6 - line 19 * * page 29, line 9 - page 36, line 20 * * page 50, line 13 - page 52, line 12 *; | [Y] - NGMN, "NGMN RECOMMENDATION ON SON & O&M REQUIREMENTS", 3GPP DRAFT; S5-090009 NGMN_RECOMMENDATION_ON_SON_AND_O_M_REQUIREMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081205), no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20090112, XP050335477 [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs 2.2 to 2.6; paragraphs 2.10 to 2.12; paragraphs 3.2 to 3.3; paragraphs 3.5 and 3.7; paragraph 5.1 * | [Y] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "SON Use Case: Cell Phy_ID Automated Configuration", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-080376 (PHYID AUTOCONF), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080204), vol. RAN WG3, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080211, XP050163582 [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs 2.1 to 2.2.5 * | [A] - SUJUAN FENG ET AL, "Self-Organizing Networks (SON) in 3GPP Long Term Evolution", INTERNET CITATION, (20080520), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.nomor.de/uploads/gc/TQ/gcTQfDWApo9osPfQwQoBzw/SelfOrganisi ngNetworksInLTE_2008-05.pdf, (20090327), XP007907980 [A] 1-15 * Introduction; page 1/15, right column, line 5 to page 5/15, right column, last line * | [A] - 3GPP, "3GPP TR 36.902 V0.0.1 (2008-02); 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group TSG RAN Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Self-configuring and self-optimizing network use cases and solutions (Release 8)", 3GPP TR 36.902,, (20080201), pages 1 - 11, XP002534011 [A] 1,8-15 * paragraphs 4.4 to 4.4.2; paragraphs 4.5 to 4.6.2 * | by applicant | EP1784031 |