EP2108777 - Casing for a rolling shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUBENDORFF Société Anonyme 24, Rue de Paris 68220 Attenschwiller / FR | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drouet, Sébastien 27A, Rue du Maréchal de Saxe F-68300, SAINT-LOUIS NEUVEG / FR | [2013/23] |
Former [2009/42] | 01 /
Drouet, Sébastien 27A, Rue du Maréchal de Saxe F-68300, SAINT-LOUIS NEUVEG / FR | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain, et al Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Rhein, Alain, et al CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN 17, rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | ||
Former [2009/42] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17 Rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 09305289.2 | 07.04.2009 | [2009/42] | Priority number, date | FR20080052344 | 08.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852344 | FR20080052839 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852839 | [2009/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2108777 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2108777 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2108777 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/17 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
E06B9/17076 (EP);
E06B9/1703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | Rollladenkasten | [2009/42] | English: | Casing for a rolling shutter | [2009/42] | French: | Caisson de volet roulant | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2009 | AT | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | IT | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | NO | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2898379 (ZURFLUH FELLER SOC PAR ACTIONS [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE20021804U | FR2843161 | FR2777938 | FR2898379 |