EP2256729 - Holographic storage system using homodyne detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Przygodda, Frank Friedrichstr. 6/1 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
Malki, Oliver Muehlaeckerweg 10 78176 Fuetzen / DE | 03 /
Trautner, Heiko Im Marbental 20 78089 Unterkirnach / DE | [2011/11] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Przygodda, Frank Benediktinerring 3 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
02 /
Malki, Oliver Muehlaeckerweg 10 78176 Fuetzen / DE | |||
03 /
Trautner, Heiko Im Marbental 20 78089 Unterkirnach / DE | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 09305473.2 | 25.05.2009 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256729 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/125, G11B7/135, // G11B7/0065 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
G11B7/1392 (EP);
G03H1/02 (EP);
G03H1/22 (EP);
G03H1/2249 (EP);
G03H1/2286 (EP);
G11B7/127 (EP);
G11B7/1384 (EP);
G03H2001/0212 (EP);
G03H2222/24 (EP);
G11B7/0065 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Holographisches Speichersystem mit homodyner Detektion | [2010/48] | English: | Holographic storage system using homodyne detection | [2010/48] | French: | Système de stockage holographique utilisant la détection homodyne | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5883875 (COUFAL HANS JUERGEN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [DA]US2008130461 (PAULIAT GILLES [FR], et al) [DA] 1-10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0052] , [0053] *; | [X] - YANG J J ET AL, "WHITE LIGHT MICROGRATING MULTIPLEXING FOR HIGH DENSITY DATA STORAGE", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20060501), vol. 31, no. 9, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1304 - 1306, XP001242644 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.31.001304 | [X] - FRÉDÉRIC GUATTARI ET AL, "Balanced homodyne detection of Bragg microholograms in photopolymer for data storage", OPTICS EXPRESS, OSA (OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA), WASHINGTON DC, (US), (20070305), vol. 15, no. 5, ISSN 1094-4087, pages 2234 - 2243, XP007909818 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - GILLES PAULIAT ET AL, "Lippmann Holographic Storage with Homodyne Detection and Single Side Access", CP992, RIAO/OPTILAS 2007, AMERICAN INSTITUDE OF PHYSICS, (20070101), ISBN 978-0-7354-0511-0, pages 350 - 355, XP007909817 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - MAIRE G ET AL, "HOMODYNE DETECTION READOUT FOR BIT-ORIENTED HOLOGRAPHIC MEMORIES", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20060115), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 175 - 177, XP001239015 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.31.000175 | by applicant | US2008130461 |