EP2213933 - Photovoltaic solar lampposts with network connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energias Renovables del Principado, S.A. C/ Covadonga, 28. 6°C 33002 Oviedo / ES | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norniella Carreño, Manuel Angel C/ Covadonga, 28. 6°C 33002 Oviedo (Cantabria) / ES | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Manzano Cantos, Gregorio Cabinet Manzano Avda. Pedro Diez, 21 Duplicado 1° Oficina 9 28019 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Manzano Cantos, Gregorio Cabinet Manzano Embajadores, 55 28012 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09380015.9 | 30.01.2009 | [2010/31] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213933 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/08, F21S9/03, F21V23/00, // F21W131/103 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
F21S9/035 (EP,US);
F21S8/086 (EP,US);
F21V17/02 (EP,US);
F21V23/00 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (EP,US);
Y02B20/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Photovoltaische und solare Beleuchtungsmasten mit Netzwerkanschluss | [2010/31] | English: | Photovoltaic solar lampposts with network connection | [2010/31] | French: | Poteaux d'éclairage à énergie solaire photovoltaic avec connexion au réseau | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 05.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2449102 (JORDAN CLIVE NICHOLAS [GB]) [X] 1 * page 1, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4; | [YA]US2008247155 (ALLSOP JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,3-5 * [A] 1; | [YA]EP1431653 (TOSHIJI KISHIMURA [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0024] * [A] 1; | [YA]WO2007104904 (BALMER STEPHEN [GB]) [Y] 4 * page 5, line 7 - line 29 * * page 16, line 28 - page 17, line 4 * [A] 1; | [A]DE19723617 (SOLARTECHNIK R PFISTER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1882228 (NE PAGE JUSTUS F) [A] 1,4 * page 1, line 72 - line 76 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2007117064 (WORLD TOP TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0024] * * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 6 *; | [A]US2007247859 (HADDAD ERIC O M [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0044] , [0045] * |