EP2282606 - Control method for an induction apparatus, and induction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coprecitec, S.L. Avda. Alava, 3 20550 Aretxabaleta (Gipuzkoa) / ES | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandez Llona, Gonzalo José c/ San José, 8-1[deg] Izq. 48230 Elorrio (Bizkaia) / ES | 02 /
Garrido, Javier Rubiales c/ Uriburu, 1-1[deg] Drch. 20500 Mondragon (Gipuzkoa) / ES | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Igartua, Ismael, et al Galbaian S.Coop. Polo de Innovación Garaia Goiru Kalea 1 - P.O. Box 213 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón (Gipuzkoa) / ES | [2012/28] |
Former [2012/16] | Igartua, Ismael Dpto. Propiedad Industrial; Apdo. 213 20500 Mondragon (Gipuzkoa) / ES | ||
Former [2011/06] | Igartua, Ismael Dpto. Propiedad Industrial; Apdo. 213 20500 Mondragon (Gipuzkoa) / ES | Application number, filing date | 09380143.9 | 05.08.2009 | [2011/06] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282606 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282606 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP,US);
H05B2213/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | Steuerungsverfahren für eine Induktionsvorrichtung und Induktionsvorrichtung | [2011/06] | English: | Control method for an induction apparatus, and induction apparatus | [2011/06] | French: | Procédé de commande pour un appareil à induction et appareil à induction | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 06.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2009 | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | GR | 18.04.2012 | HR | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MK | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | SM | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | NO | 18.07.2012 | IE | 05.08.2012 | LU | 05.08.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/38] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 18.04.2012 | ||
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
SM | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
LU | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 18.04.2012 | ||
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
SM | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
LU | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
SM | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
LU | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | |
NO | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1935214 (EGO ELEKTRO GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1935214 |