EP2338940 - Composition for coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicalia S.L. C/Grabador Esteve, 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Silicalia S.L. C/Grabador Esteve, 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoneveld, Erik Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | 02 /
Sanchis Brines, Francisco Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | 03 /
Ortega Murguialday, Amaya Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | 04 /
Gómez Cordón, Julio Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | 05 /
Lorente Aroca, Dolores Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | 06 /
Cordero Etchaberry, Diana Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Schoneveld, Erik Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | ||
02 /
Sanchis Brines, Francisco Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | |||
03 /
Ortega Murguialday, Amaya Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | |||
04 /
Gómez Cordón, Julio Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | |||
05 /
Lorente Aroca, Dolores Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | |||
06 /
Cordero Etchaberry, Diana Silicalia, SL c/ Grabador Esteve 8 46004 Valencia (Valencia) / ES | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669bis, 1r 2a 08013 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669bis, 1r 2a 08013 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 09380197.5 | 23.12.2009 | [2011/26] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338940 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338940 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP,KR,US);
B05D1/00 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/45 (KR);
C04B41/4922 (EP,US);
C04B41/64 (EP,US);
C09D183/06 (EP,US);
C09D183/08 (US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
C08K3/01 (EP,US);
C08K3/14 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/28 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K3/38 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B14/285 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B14/285, C04B26/125 (US,EP);
C04B41/4922, C04B41/4549, C04B41/5059 (EP,US);
C04B41/4922, C04B41/5035 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Beschichtungszusammensetzung | [2011/26] | English: | Composition for coating | [2011/26] | French: | Composition de revêtement | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 29.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | IE | 23.12.2016 | LU | 23.12.2016 | MT | 23.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006008739 (ELUTEX LTD [IL], et al) [X] 12-16 * examples 1-9; claims 1-122 *; | [X]WO2006010663 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [X] 1-16* examples 1-3 *; | [XD]WO2006042116 (APPLIED THIN FILMS INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-16 * examples 1-34; claim 20 *; | [X]EP1832629 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [X] 12-16 * examples 1-6; claims 1-28 *; | [X]WO2007102960 (ASHLAND LICENSING & INTELLECTU [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 6, paragraph 1; examples 1-4; claims 1-14 *; | [X]WO2008085550 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [X] 12-16 * examples 1-8; claims 1-47 *; | [X]WO2009032988 (ASHLAND LICENSING & INTELLECTU [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0026]; examples 1-4; claims 1-33 *; | [X]EP2085442 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0053] , [0065]; claim 46 * | by applicant | US5751018 | WO2004094303 | EP1802455 |