EP2228367 - Addition salts of amines containing hydroxyl and/or carboxylic groups with amino nicotinic acid derivatives as DHODH inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Almirall, S.A. Ronda General Mitre 151 08022 Barcelona / ES | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perez Garcia, Juan Bautista C/ Laureà Miró, 408-410 08980, SANT FELIU DE LLOBREGAT (Barcelon / ES | 02 /
Carrera Carrera, Francesc C/ Laureà Miró, 408-410 08980, SANT FELIU DE LLOBREGAT (Barcelon / ES | 03 /
Garcia Martin, Digna Jose Laureà Miró, 408-410 08980, SANT FELIU DE LLOBREGAT (Barcelon / ES | 04 /
Boix Bernardini, Maria Carmen Laureà Miró, 408-410 08980, SANT FELIU DE LLOBREGAT (Barcelon / ES | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09382031.4 | 13.03.2009 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228367 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/80, A61K31/455, A61P37/00 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/455 (KR);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/20] |
Former [2010/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusatzsalze von Aminen mit Hydroxyl- und/oder Carboxylgruppen mit Aminonicotinsäurederivaten als DHODH-Inhibitoren | [2010/37] | English: | Addition salts of amines containing hydroxyl and/or carboxylic groups with amino nicotinic acid derivatives as DHODH inhibitors | [2010/37] | French: | Sels adjuvants d'amines contenant des groupes hydroxyle et/ou carbonyle avec des dérivés d'acides aminonicotiques en tant qu'inhibiteurs de la DHODH | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO2008077639 (ALMIRALL LAB [ES], et al) [DX] 1-9,11,16-23* page 8, line 7 - line 15; claims 1,25 * | by applicant | WO9945926 | WO02080897 | WO03006425 | WO2004056747 | WO2004056746 | WO2006001961 | WO2006022442 | WO2006044741 | ES2301380 | WO2008077639 | ES2303758 |