EP2138222 - Method for pore size modification of an inorganic membrane by chemical vapor infiltration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakellaropoulos, George P. Aristotele University of Thessaloniki Chemical Eng. Dept. P.O. Box 1520 54006 Thessaloniki / GR | For all designated states Kalidis, Sotiris Aristotele University of Thessaloniki Chemical Eng. Dept. P.O. Box 1520 54006 Thessaloniki / GR | For all designated states Koutsonikolas, Dimitris Aristotele University of Thessaloniki Chemical Eng. Dept. P.O. Box 1520 54006 Thessaloniki / GR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/01] | Application number, filing date | 09386016.1 | 25.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | GR20080100438 | 27.06.2008 Original published format: GR 20080100438 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138222 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2138222 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, B01D67/00, B01D65/10 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B01D67/0093 (EP,US);
C04B41/4529 (GR);
B01D65/106 (EP);
B01D67/0072 (EP);
B01D71/027 (EP);
C23C16/045 (GR);
B01D2323/08 (EP);
B01D2323/081 (US);
B01D2323/283 (EP);
B01D2323/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Methode zur Modifizierung der Porengrösse inorganischer Membranen mit Hilfe von chemischer Gasphaseninfiltration | [2010/01] | English: | Method for pore size modification of an inorganic membrane by chemical vapor infiltration | [2010/01] | French: | Methode de modification de la taille des pores par infiltration chimique en phase vapeur | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | HR | 08.06.2011 | HU | 08.06.2011 | IT | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | LV | 08.06.2011 | MK | 08.06.2011 | MT | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | LU | 25.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | NO | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LU | 25.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
LU | 25.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
LU | 25.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
MT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
HR | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
NO | 08.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
NO | 08.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO9601682 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [ID] 1-3,5-7 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 76, paragraph 1; figure 1; claims 1-3,6 *; | [A]US5683797 (CAROLAN MICHAEL FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 7, line 21 - line 34 * * column 9, line 22 - line 55; claim 1 *; | [A]US5753121 (GEUS EDUARD RUDOLF [NL], et al) [A] 1,3* column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 40 *; | [X]US2007013094 (BISCHOFSBERGER NORMAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12 * paragraphs [0054] - [0059] * | by applicant | US4902307 | US5453298 | WO9601682 | US5827569 | US6527833 | US6854602 | US2007013094 | - S. GOPALAKRISHNAN; Y. YOSHINO; M. NOMURA; B. N. NAIR; S-I. NAKAO, "A hybrid processing method for high performance hydrogen-selective silica membranes", J. MEMBRANE SCI., (2007), vol. 297, pages 5 - 9 | - S. SOMMER; T. MELIN, "Performance evaluation of microporous inorganic membranes in the dehydration of industrial solvents", CHEM. ENG. PROC., (2005), vol. 44, pages 1138 - 1156 |