EP2168742 - Stone cutting machine using a diamond disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEI-Companhia de Equipamentos Industriais, Lda. Rua dos Açores, 278, Zona Industrial 3700-018 S. Joao da Madeira / PT | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antunes da Silva, Agostinho Manuel Rua dos Açores, 278, Zona Industrial 3700-018 S. Joao da Madeira / PT | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Costa Franca, Vitor Hugo Avenida Duque d'Avila, 32 - 1.o 1000-141 Lisboa / PT | [2010/13] | Application number, filing date | 09398010.0 | 29.09.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | PT20080104195 | 29.09.2008 Original published format: PT 10419508 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2168742 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/04, B23D59/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
B28D1/043 (EP);
B23D59/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steinsägemaschine unter Verwendung einer Diamantscheibe | [2010/13] | English: | Stone cutting machine using a diamond disc | [2010/13] | French: | Machine de découpe de pierres à l'aide d'un disque diamanté | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4206274 (TONCELLI LUCA [IT]) [Y] 1 * column 3, lines 32-40 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 41 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2; | [YA]US2005288161 (TONCELLI DARIO [IT]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0019] , [0033] , [0034] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0052] - [0054] - [0056] , [0057] * * figures 1,2,5,7 * [A] 2; | [A]US6740417 (SIEVERS THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 4-10 * * column 8, lines 21-26 *; | [A]DE4019300 (POELLMANN KONSTRUKTION ENTWICK [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 18-31 * * column 4, lines 12-40 * * column 5, lines 3-64 * * figures 1,4 * | by applicant | PT104188 |