EP2211254 - Computer mouse, in particular a laser mouse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states La Vecchia, Nunzio, Dr. Monte Verita, via Collina 93 6612 Ascona / CH | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [2010/30] | Application number, filing date | 09405009.3 | 15.01.2009 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | EP20090405009 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: EP 09405009 | [2010/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211254 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/0317 (EP,US);
G06F3/03543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Computermaus, insbesondere eine Lasermaus | [2010/30] | English: | Computer mouse, in particular a laser mouse | [2010/30] | French: | Souris d'ordinateur, notamment une souris laser | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20300280U (CHENG KUO SHU [TW]) [A] 2,7 * abstract * * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005223142 (SUNG YUAN-BIING [TW]) [X] 1,2,7,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0007] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE202006011285U (DRESCHER BOB [DE]) [A] 2,7,12* the whole document * | Examination | DE20017311U | GB2399618 | DE102004015767 | WO2006064450 | KR20080055407 | WO2009062085 | by applicant | US2005223142 | DE202006011285U |