EP2168641 - Stick knob [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lekisport AG Lindenstrasse 8 6340 Baar / CH | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenhart, Klaus Mittlerer Weg 23 73275 Ohmden / DE | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 09405163.8 | 21.09.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | CH20080001522 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: CH 15222008 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2168641 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2168641 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63C11/22, A45B9/02 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
A63C11/222 (EP,US);
A45B9/02 (EP);
A63C11/2224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Stockgriff | [2010/13] | English: | Stick knob | [2010/13] | French: | Poignée de bâton | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | HR | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IE | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MK | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | SM | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | LU | 21.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
SM | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
LU | 21.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
SM | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
LU | 21.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
SM | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MK | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE29906612U (LENHART KLAUS [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102006008066 (FISCHER GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1832318 (TILLIM STEPHEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | DE29906612U | DE102006008066 | EP1848298 |