EP2131630 - Smart led street lamp designed for saving energy, monitored and controlled by a remote control center [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecnologie e Servizi Innovativi - T.S.I. S.r.l. Via del Sersimone, 29 05100 Terni (TR) / IT | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sensidoni, Claudio, T.S.I. S.r.l. Via del Sersimone n. 29 05100 Terni / IT | [2009/50] | Application number, filing date | 09425216.0 | 29.05.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | IT2008TR00002U | 06.06.2008 Original published format: IT TR20080002 U | [2009/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2131630 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2131630 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/03, H05B37/02, H05B33/08, H04W84/18 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
H05B47/22 (EP,US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
F21S8/086 (EP);
F21W2131/103 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | H05B37/02, H05B37/03, H05B33/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Intelligente LED-Strassenlampe zum Energiesparen, die von einem ferngesteuerten Steuerzentrum überwacht und gesteuert wird | [2009/50] | English: | Smart led street lamp designed for saving energy, monitored and controlled by a remote control center | [2009/50] | French: | Lampadaire intelligent à DEL conçu pour l'économie d'énergie, surveillé et contrôlé par un centre de contrôle distant | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007085701 (WALTERS JEFF D [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0155] * * figures 1-3B, 4A-5B *; | [A]US2007109142 (MCCOLLOUGH NORMAN D JR [US]) [A] 3 * paragraph [0018] * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0639938 (TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE [AT]) [A] 3 * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 24 *; | [A]WO2006126240 (PANTALEONI GIAMPAOLO [IT]) [A] 5 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - page 3, line 22 * * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 2 * * figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [A]WO03098977 (CELLUX AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 6, line 13 - page 8, line 3 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2006203714 (WESSELS JOHANNES H [NL], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP0620699 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 5 * page 2, line 24 - page 2, line 27 *; | [A]WO2008011724 (TIR TECHONOLOGY LP [CA], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0095] * * figures 3,6 * |