EP2339323 - The method of simulation of kinetics movement of bulk solid particles and facilities to carry out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vysoka Skola Banska-Technicka Univerzita 17, Listopadu 15/2172 708 33 Ostrava - Poruba / CZ | [2019/19] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Vysoka Skola Banska-Technicka Univerzita 17, Listopadu 15/2172 708 33 Ostrava - Poruba / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zegzulka, Jiri Okruzni 19/1322 747 14 Ludgerovice / CZ | 02 /
Bortlik, Petr Sokolovská 15/387 747 23 Bolatice / CZ | 03 /
Dokoupil, Otakar K Zebracce 56 751 21 Prosenice / CZ | 04 /
Brazda, Robert Gen. Sochora 1763/24 708 00 Ostrava - Poruba / CZ | 05 /
Necas, Jan Srobarova 524/10 720 00 Ostrava - Hrabova / CZ | [2019/19] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Zegzulka, Jiri Okruzni 19/1322 747 14 Ludgerovice / CZ | ||
02 /
Bortlik, Petr Sokolovská 15/387 747 23 Bolatice / CZ | |||
03 /
Dokoupil, Otakar K Zebracce 56 751 21 Prosenice / CZ | |||
04 /
Brazda, Robert Gen. Sochora 1763/24 708 00 Ostrava - Poruba / CZ | |||
05 /
Necas, Jan Srobarova 524/10 720 00 Ostrava - Hrabova / CZ | Representative(s) | Kendereski, Dusan Turanka 115g 627 00 Brno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Kendereski, Dusan Koliste 13a 602 00 Brno / CZ | ||
Former [2012/50] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/24] | Plicka, Josef, et al Cermák a spol. Elisky Peskove 15/735 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 09466006.5 | 05.06.2009 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2011/26] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339323 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2339323 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2339323 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/00, G01N11/06, G01F3/28 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
G01N11/00 (EP);
G01F3/28 (EP);
G01N11/06 (EP);
G01N33/0091 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | G01N11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Simulation der kinetischen Bewegung von festen Schüttpartikeln und Anlagen zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2011/26] | English: | The method of simulation of kinetics movement of bulk solid particles and facilities to carry out the method | [2011/26] | French: | Procédé de simulation de mouvement cinétique de particules solides en vrac et installations permettant d'effectuer le procédé | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 07.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 07.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2009 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | IE | 05.06.2019 | LU | 05.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | FR | 08.07.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | GB | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | DE | 01.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 05.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 05.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 08.05.2019 | |
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2045193 (ALBERT LETREUX) [A] 1-16 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 36; figure 1 *; | [X]GB977282 (MENDLE BROTHERS LTD) [X] 8-16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1547692 (WOOD G R) [A] 8-13 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US4716768 (DAVID AGOSTON [HU], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5165291 (GALETTO WILLIAM G [US], et al) [A] 8 * figure 5 *; | [A]US6367336 (MARTINA HUGO GABRIEL [AR], et al) [A] 1-16* figure 1 *; | [A]US6472615 (CARLSON BRENT T [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1977737 (WYETH CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009078029 (MATSUSAKA SHUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - ERIC I. CORWIN, "granular flow in a rapidly rotated system with fixed walls", PHYSICAL REVIEW, (20080319), vol. 77, no. 031308, pages 1 - 8, XP002643377 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |