EP2240506 - INHIBITORS OF IAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NDUBAKU, Chudi 1050 Mississippi Street, 3 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | 02 /
FLYGARE, John A. 1419 Vancouver Avenue Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 03 /
COHEN, Frederick 1551 24th Avenue San Francisco, California 94122 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/42] | 01 /
NDUBAKU, Chudi 1050 Mississippi Street, 3 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | ||
02 /
FLYGARE, John A. 1419 Vancouver Avenue Burlingame, California 94010 / US | |||
03 /
COHEN, Frederick 2001 McAllister Street, 143 San Francisco, California 94118 / US | Representative(s) | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane GB-London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09701124.1 | 09.01.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009US30674 | Priority number, date | US20080020682 | 11.01.2008 Original published format: US 20682 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009089502 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240506 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2240506 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07K5/062, C07K5/083, A61K38/05, A61K38/06, A61P35/00 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K5/0806 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Extension states | AL | 30.07.2010 | BA | 30.07.2010 | RS | 30.07.2010 | Title | German: | IAP-HEMMER | [2010/42] | English: | INHIBITORS OF IAP | [2010/42] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE IAP | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | LU | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | EE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | EE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006014700 (COHEN FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1,5-13,15-21 * formula (I); paragraph [0064]; claims 9-13,15-21 *; | [X]WO2006069063 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-21 * formula (I); page 25, line 14 - page 44, line 3; claims 9-21 *; | [X]WO2007106192 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-13,15-21 * formula (I); page 24, line 15 - page 32, line 4; claims 9-13,15-21 *; | [X] - BODEN C D J ET AL, "Total Synthesis of the Thiazoline-based Cyclopeptide Cyclodidemnamide", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, (19961209), vol. 37, no. 50, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 9111 - 9114, XP004070573 [X] 1,4,6 * scheme 2;;; compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(96)02099-0 | [A] - HOLDER J R ET AL, "Structure-activity relationships of the melanocortin tetrapeptide Ac-His-D-Phe-Arg-Trp-NH2 at the mouse melanocortin receptors. 4. Modifications at the Trp position", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON.; US, (20021219), vol. 45, no. 26, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 5736 - 5744, XP002302531 [A] 1,6-13,15-21 * compound 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm020296e | [A] - KATALIN ÖSZ, KATALIN VÁRNAGY, HELGA SÜLI-VARGHA, DANIELE SANNA, GIOVANNI MICERA AND IMRE SÓVÁGÓ, "Transition metal complexes of bis(imidazol-2-yl) derivatives of dipeptides", DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (20030423), vol. 2003, pages 2009 - 2016, XP002516598 [A] 1-21 * Scheme 1; "GlyLeu-BIMA" * | [A] - CHRISTOPHER J MOODY, JAMES C A HUNT, "Synthesis of Virenamide b, a Cytotoxic Thiazole-Containing Peptide", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19991023), vol. 64, pages 8715 - 8717, XP002524782 [A] 1-21 * compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JO9908694 | [A] - NAKAMURA M ET AL, "Stereochemistry and Total Synthesis of Dolastatin E", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, (19950710), vol. 36, no. 28, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 5059 - 5062, XP004027736 [A] 1,4,5,9-11,21 * compound 8 * | [A] - HAMADA Y ET AL, "New methods and reagents in organic synthesis. 56. Total syntheses of patellamides B and C, cytotoxic cyclic peptides from a tunicate 2. Their real structures have been determined by their syntheses", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, vol. 26, no. 42, ISSN 0040-4039, (19850101), pages 5159 - 5162, (19850101), XP022720509 [A] 1-21 * compound 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)98891-9 | [A] - NORLEY M C ET AL, "Total Synthesis and Revision of Stereochemistry of Cyclodidemnamide, a Novel Cyclopeptide from the Marine Ascidian Didemnum molle", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, (19980507), vol. 39, no. 19, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3087 - 3090, XP004115764 [A] 1-21 * compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(98)00365-7 | [A] - CHRIS M IRELAND, AUGUSTINE R DURSO JR., ROBERT A NEWMAN, MILES P HACKER, "Antineoplastic cyclic peptides from the marine tunicate Lissoclinum patella", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 47, no. 10, pages 1807 - 1811, XP002524783 [A] 1-21 * compounds 13, 14, 19, 20, 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00349a002 | [A] - YASUMASA HAMADA, MAKOTO SHIBATA, TAKAYUKI SHIOIRI, "NEW METHODS AND REAGENTS IN ORGANIC SYNTHESIS. 58. A SYNTHESIS OF PATELLAMIDE A, A CYTOTOXIC CYCLIC PEPTIDE FROM A TUNICATE. REVISION OF ITS PROPOSED STRUCTURE", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1985), vol. 26, no. 52, pages 6501 - 6504, XP002524784 [A] 1-21 * compounds 9, 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)99037-3 |