EP2242600 - POROUS SLIDING BEARING AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Corporation 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield, MI 48033 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STURK, Robert 42010 Oak Lane Plymouth MI 48170 / US | 02 /
SAXTON, David, M. 6106 Vineyard Avenue An Arbor MI 48108 / US | 03 /
KONIECZNY, Eric 1312 Ferris Avenue Royal Oak MI 48067 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bahnhofstrasse 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstrasse 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09701261.1 | 09.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US30518 | Priority number, date | US20080020058 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: US 20058 | US20090350364 | 08.01.2009 Original published format: US 350364 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009089402 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242600 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/11, B22F7/08, B22F3/10, F16C33/10, B32B3/26 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
F16C33/14 (EP,US);
B22F3/11 (KR);
B22F3/26 (KR);
B22F7/004 (EP,US);
B22F7/08 (KR);
C22C1/0425 (EP,US);
C22C1/08 (EP,US);
C22C9/02 (EP,US);
F16C33/10 (KR);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
F16C2204/12 (EP,US);
F16C2220/20 (EP,US);
F16C2223/32 (EP,US);
F16C2223/80 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12014 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12479 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F7/04, B22F3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | PORÖSES GLEITLAGER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER KONSTRUKTION | [2010/43] | English: | POROUS SLIDING BEARING AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF | [2010/43] | French: | PALIER LISSE POREUX ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 02.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10138058 (FEDERAL MOGUL DEVA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0022]; claims 1-22; table 1 *; | [XDA]US6746154 (GREENE ROBERT L [US], et al) [XD] 5,9 * column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 20 * [A] 1-4,6-8,10-14; | [X]EP1605069 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0038] * | International search | [A]JPH09301256 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD); | [A]JP2002285262 (DAIDO METAL CO LTD); | [X]US6746154 (GREENE ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]JP2007270254 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS PMG CORP, et al) |