EP2242820 - PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF AN AQUEOUS STREAM COMING FROM THE FISCHER-TROPSCH REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Rome / IT | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLERICI, Gabriele Via G.B. Morgagni 11 I-20129 Milan / IT | 02 /
LOCATELLI, Lino " " deceased / IT | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
CLERICI, Gabriele Via G.B. Morgagni 11 I-20129 Milan / IT | Representative(s) | Bottero, Carlo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2012/23] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/43] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09701811.3 | 14.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009EP00389 | Priority number, date | IT2008MI00079 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: IT MI20080079 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090104 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242820 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2242820 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10G2/00, C02F1/04, C02F1/20 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
C10G2/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/20 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1022 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINES WÄSSRIGEN STROMS AUS DER FISCHER-TROPSCH-REAKTION | [2010/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF AN AQUEOUS STREAM COMING FROM THE FISCHER-TROPSCH REACTION | [2010/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'UN COURANT AQUEUX PROVENANT DE LA RÉACTION DE FISCHER-TROPSCH | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 03.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2009 | AT | 10.10.2012 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | MK | 10.10.2012 | MT | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | IE | 14.01.2013 | LU | 14.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | FR | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MK | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IE | 14.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IE | 14.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IE | 14.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB647903 (STANDARD OIL DEV CO) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6462097 (MARTINO GERMAIN [FR], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03048272 (SASOL TECH PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003125396 (ESPINOZA RAFAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6887908 (PRUET RANDALL B [ID]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]US2005131085 (KOHLER LUIS P F [ZA], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |