EP2152487 - RECYCLING CARBON FIBRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELG Carbon Fibre Limited Cannon Business Park Gough Road Coseley Dudley West Midlands WV14 8XR / GB | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Recycled Carbon Fibre Limited Cannon Business Park Gough Road Coseley Dudley West Midlands WV14 8XR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDSON, John 18 Wards Drive Muir of Ord Scotland Ross-Shire IV6 7PX / GB | 02 /
PRICE, Roy Wootton Mead Stratford Road Henley-in-Arden Warwickshire B95 6AP / GB | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09701931.9 | 19.01.2009 | [2010/07] | WO2009EP50564 | Priority number, date | GB20080000940 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: GB 0800940 | US20080021953 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: US 21953 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090264 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2152487 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152487 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/02, C10B53/07, F27B9/04, F27B9/40 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
C10B53/07 (EP,US);
C10B7/06 (EP,US);
F27B9/045 (EP,US);
F27B9/40 (EP,US);
F27D17/001 (EP,US);
F27D19/00 (EP,US);
F27D7/06 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0496 (EP,US);
B29K2105/06 (EP,US);
B29K2707/04 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3085 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3091 (EP,US);
B29L2031/5245 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | WIEDERVERWENDBARE KOHLENSTOFFFASER | [2010/07] | English: | RECYCLING CARBON FIBRE | [2010/07] | French: | RECYCLAGE DE FIBRE DE CARBONE | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 05.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2810043 (GEORG MENDHEIM GMBH) [X] 12,14-16 * page 23, paragraph 2; figure 3 *; | [XY]JPH0699160 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 18,22,23 * paragraphs [0007] , [0014] , [0015] * [Y] 21; | [X]JPH06298993 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 23 * paragraph [0019] *; | [XY]WO03089212 (ENEA ENTE NUOVE TEC [IT], et al) [X] 23 * page 13, line 23 - line 25; table 3 * [Y] 21; | [A]DE102005001569 (STROHMENGER PATRICK [DE]) [A] 1-23* paragraphs [0033] , [0041] *; | [X]US2006246391 (GAUR SIDDHARTHA [US], et al) [X] 12,14-16 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] *; | [A] - SCHUBERT T ET AL, "REZYKLIERTES CFK ALS VERSTAERKUNGSSTOFF IN THERMOPLASTEN THERMISCHE ZERSETZUNG DER MATRIX", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20000201), vol. 90, no. 2, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 78 - 80,82, XP000936831 [A] 1-23 * page 80, column L * | by applicant | DE2810043 | JPH0699160 | JPH06298993 | WO03089212 | US2006246391 |