EP2248079 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUDITING INTERNAL CONTROLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Reuters Global Resources Neuhofstrasse 1 6340 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Thomson Reuters Global Resources Landis + Gyr-Strasse 3 6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRADLING, L., Scott 5101 Squaw Creek Ct. Fort Worth TX 76137 / US | 02 /
LINDSEY, Stephen, W. 6267 Halifax Rd Fort Worth TX 76116 / US | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09702141.4 | 20.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US00374 | Priority number, date | US20080009337 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: US 9337 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009091613 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2248079 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00, G06Q40/02 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
G06F21/577 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM AUDITIEREN INTERNER STEUERELEMENTE | [2010/45] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUDITING INTERNAL CONTROLS | [2010/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR AUDITER DES CONTRÔLES INTERNES | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/07] | 06.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2017 | 07.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2005065839 (BENSON DEBRA [US], et al); | [Y]US2005209876 (KENNIS PETER H [US], et al); | [A]US2006047561 (BOLTON CHARLES N [CH]); | [Y]US2006259316 (BRESLIN JUD [US], et al) |