EP2244696 - CARRIER PELLETS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADD Advanced Drug Delivery Technologies, Ltd. Kraftwerkstrasse 6 4133 Pratteln / CH | [2015/27] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states IPC Process-Center GmbH & Co. KG Grunaer Weg 26 01277 Dresden / DE | ||
For all designated states ADD Advanced Drug Delivery Technologies Ltd. Kraftwerkstrasse 6 4133 Pratteln / CH | |||
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states IPC Process-Center GmbH & Co. KG Grunaer Weg 26 01277 Dresden / DE | ||
For all designated states ADD Technologies Ltd. Kägenstrasse 17 4153 Reinach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIGT, Antje Augustusbergstrasse 5 01277 Dresden / DE | 02 /
KEMPE, Wolfgang Hainbuchenstrasse 18 01169 Dresden / DE | 03 /
SCHLÜTERMANN, Burkhard Im Schlauch 4 79280 Au / DE | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/44] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Theresienhöhe 13 D-80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09702374.1 | 12.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009EP00124 | Priority number, date | DE20081004893 | 17.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008004893 | [2010/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009090027 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2244696 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2244696 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/1617 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/1682 (US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2010/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRÄGERPELLETS, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2010/44] | English: | CARRIER PELLETS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF | [2010/44] | French: | SUPPORT SOUS FORME DE PASTILLES, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/44] | EXCIPIENTS SOUS FORME DE PASTILLES, PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉS ET UTILISATION EXIPIENTS | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 05.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.05.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 10.06.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 13.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15172814.4 / EP2949320 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1262198 (PHARMA PASS S A [FR]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9716078 (GIVAUDAN ROURE INT [CH], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1317925 (ISTITUTO BIOCHIMICO ITALIANO [IT]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]US5902844 (WILSON EDWARD S [US]) [X] 24-32 * the whole document *; | JP2007297313 [ ] (LION CORP); | [A]US6492024 (WALTER KIM TORBEN [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006052503 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP1958520 (SYMRISE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1,24 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005163855 (CHO CHEONG W [KR], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X] - ONEDA F ET AL, "The effect of formulation variables on the dissolution and physical properties of spray-dried microspheres containing organic salts", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (20030101), no. 130, ISSN 0032-5910, pages 377 - 384, XP002429927 [X] 24-32 * the whole document * | [A] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20071206), Database accession no. 147:528145, XP002555058 [A] 1-32 * abstract * | [APL] - JACOB ET AL, "ProCell technology: Modelling and application", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 189, no. 2, ISSN 0032-5910, (20090131), pages 332 - 342, (20080424), XP025884765 [AP] 1 * the whole document * [L] DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.powtec.2008.04.035 | [A] - KORAKIANITI E S ET AL, "Sequential optimization of a pelletization process in a fluid bed rotor granulator", JOURNAL OF DRUG DELIVERY SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ED. DE SANTÉ, FR, (20040501), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 1773-2247, pages 207 - 214, XP008114543 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * | Examination | DE19733094 | JP2001294524 | - NISHIKAWA G ET AL, "LARGE SCALE UREA GRANULATION PLANTS BASED ON TEC TECHNOLOGY", (20010101), pages 1 - 12, 20010101, URL: http://www.toyo-eng.co.jp/en/advantage/technology/petrochemistry/urea_technology/technical_paper/pdf/2001_Large_Scale_Urea_Granulation_Plants.pdf, XP001562285 |