EP2234063 - SKIN COLOR EVALUATION METHOD, SKIN COLOR EVALUATION APPARATUS, SKIN COLOR EVALUATION PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM WITH THE PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiseido Company, Ltd. 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Hironobu c/o SHISEIDO COMPANY LTD. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor, Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street 156 Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09702552.2 | 14.01.2009 | [2010/39] | WO2009JP50347 | Priority number, date | JP20080008370 | 17.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008008370 | [2010/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090948 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2234063 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T1/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20021 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30088 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | HAUTFARBENBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN, HAUTFARBENBESTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG, HAUTFARBENBESTIMMUNGSPROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DEM DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEN PROGRAMM | [2010/39] | English: | SKIN COLOR EVALUATION METHOD, SKIN COLOR EVALUATION APPARATUS, SKIN COLOR EVALUATION PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM WITH THE PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE COULEUR DE PEAU, APPAREIL D'ÉVALUATION DE COULEUR DE PEAU, PROGRAMME D'ÉVALUATION DE COULEUR DE PEAU, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT AVEC LE PROGRAMME ENREGISTRÉ SUR CELUI-CI | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2010 | Translation filed | 14.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 30.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06282614 (ATR TSUSHIN SYST KENKYUSHO); | [Y]JPH08308634 (POLA CHEM IND INC); | [Y]JPH08329278 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2001000419 (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [Y]JP2004265406 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]JP2004321793 (INFORWARD INC); | [A]WO2006043702 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP], et al) |