EP2242660 - HYDRAULIC BUSHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOGE Elastmetall GmbH Dr.-Jürgen-Ulderup-Platz 1 49401 Damme / DE | [2015/27] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Z F Group North American Operations, Inc. 15811 Centennial Drive Northville, MI 48167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUTEN, Jeffrey, D. 3980 Spencer Terrace West Bloomfield MI 48323 / US | 02 /
WEITZMANN, Juergen 43002 Brookstone Drive Novi MI 48377 / US | 03 /
HAN, Jin, Kyu 2755 Windwood Drive Apt. 211 Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
AUTEN, Jeffrey, D. 3980 Spencer Terrace West Bloomfield MI 48323 / US | ||
02 /
WEITZMANN, Juergen 43002 Brookstone Drive Novi MI 48377 / US | |||
03 /
HAN, Jin, Kyu 2755 Windwood Drive Apt. 211 Ann Arbor, MA 48105 / US | Representative(s) | Bossmeyer, Jörg Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 60 19 49093 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Vogt, Alexander ZF Friedrichshafen AG Corporate Intellectual Property Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | McWilliams, David John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09703068.8 | 16.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US31244 | Priority number, date | US20080021460 | 16.01.2008 Original published format: US 21460 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009091973 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242660 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60G11/26, B60G7/02, F16F13/14, F16F13/16 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
F16F13/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | B60G11/26, B60G7/02, F16F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | HYDRO-BUCHSE | [2010/43] | English: | HYDRAULIC BUSHING | [2010/43] | French: | DOUILLE HYDRAULIQUE | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 14.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 03.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003151178 (VOSSEL ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH0622642U (YOICHI KAWAMOTO [JP]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2006113717 (SATO YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]JP2004518927 (ANDREAS VOSSEL, ET AL.); | [X]US6644633 (GRAEVE ARNDT [DE]); | [Y]JP2005507065 (SIEMER HUBERT, ET AL.); | [Y]US4667942 (BITSCHKUS HORST [DE], et al); | [A]US7198256 (TATURA ALFRED [DE], et al); | [A]US4964623 (THORN RICHARD P [US]); | [A]US4872651 (THORN RICHARD P [US]) | by applicant | US2003151178 | JPH0622642U | US2006113717 |