EP2242841 - THERMAL AND ACID TOLERANT BETA-XYLOSIDASES, GENES ENCODING, RELATED ORGANISMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC P.O. Box 1625 Idaho Falls, ID 83415-3899 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, David, N. 2362 Hoopes Avenue Idaho Falls, ID 83404 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Vicki, S. 2362 Hoopers Avenue Idaho Falls, ID 83404 / US | 03 /
SCHALLER, Kastli 1232 Curlew Drive Ammon, ID 83406 / US | 04 /
APEL, William, A. P.O. Box 9729 Jackson, WY 83002 / US | 05 /
REED, David, W. 1160 Homer Avenue Idaho Falls, ID 83404 / US | 06 /
LACEY, Jeffrey, A. 3963 Willow Ridge Drive Idaho Falls, ID 83406 / US | 07 /
APEL, William, A. P.o. Box 9729 Jackson, WY 83002 / US | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
THOMPSON, David, N. 2362 Hoopes Avenue Idaho Falls, ID 83404 / US | ||
02 /
THOMPSON, Vicki, S. 2362 Hoopers Avenue Idaho Falls, ID 83404 / US | |||
03 /
SCHALLER, Kastli 1232 Curlew Drive Ammon, ID 83406 / US | |||
04 /
APEL, William, A. P.O. Box 9729 Jackson, WY 83002 / US | |||
05 /
REED, David, W. 1160 Homer Avenue Idaho Falls, ID 83404 / US | |||
06 /
LACEY, Jeffrey, A. 4212 Birchwood Circle Idaho Falls, ID 83406 / US | |||
07 /
APEL, William, A. P.o. Box 9729 Jackson, WY 83002 / US | Representative(s) | Habets, Winand Johannes Antonius Life Science Patents P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Habets, Winand Life Science Patents PO Box 5096 6130 PB Sittard / NL | Application number, filing date | 09703173.6 | 23.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US00442 | Priority number, date | US20080023639P | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 23639 P | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009094187 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242841 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/42, D21C1/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01037 (EP,US);
C12N9/2402 (EP,US);
C12N9/248 (EP,US);
C12N9/2482 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01055 (EP,US);
D21C5/005 (EP,US);
D21C11/0007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | WÄRME- UND SÄURESTABILE BETA-XYLOSIDASEN, GENE ZU IHRER KODIERUNG, ENTSPRECHENDE ORGANISMEN UND VERFAHREN | [2010/43] | English: | THERMAL AND ACID TOLERANT BETA-XYLOSIDASES, GENES ENCODING, RELATED ORGANISMS, AND METHODS | [2010/43] | French: | BETA-XYLOSIDASES TOLÉRANTE À L'ACIDE ET À LA CHALEUR, GÈNES CODANT POUR CES BETA-XYLOSIDASES, ORGANISMES ASSOCIÉS ET PROCÉDÉS | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 03.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/41] | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "1095521783334 Global-Ocean-Sampling_GS-33-01-01-1P3-1P8KB marine metagenome genomic clone 1061006108911 3', genomic survey sequence.", EMBL, (20070316), Database accession no. ER073884, URL: EBI, XP002627757 [X] 4 * abstract * | [XA] - BREVES ROLAND ET AL, "Genes encoding two different beta-glucosidases of Thermoanaerobacter brockii are clustered in a common operon", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 63, no. 10, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 3902 - 3910, XP002627732 [X] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,8-11 | [XA] - "SubName: Full=Beta-xylo-glucosidase;", UniProt, (19970501), Database accession no. P96090, URL: EBI, XP002630045 [X] 7 * abstract * [A] 1-6,8-11 | [A] - BHATIA Y ET AL, "MICROBIAL BETA-GLUCOSIDASES: CLONING, PROPERTIES, AND APPLICATIONS", CRC CRITICAL REVIEWS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, CRC PRESS, BOCA RATON, FL, US, (20020101), vol. 22, no. 4, doi:10.1080/07388550290789568, ISSN 0738-8551, pages 375 - 407, XP009063911 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/07388550290789568 | [XP] - "SubName: Full=Glycoside hydrolase family 3 domain protein;", UniProt, (20091103), Database accession no. C8WTP2, URL: EBI, XP002627733 [XP] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - "Thermotoga maritima endoglucanase.", Geneseq, (19980521), Database accession no. AAW35004, URL: EBI, XP002627734 [X] 7 * abstract * | [X] - "SubName: Full=Glycoside hydrolase, family 3 domain protein;", UniProt, (20070626), Database accession no. A5IKZ4, URL: EBI, XP002627735 [X] 7 * compound . * | [X] - "SubName: Full=Beta-xylosidase;", UniProt, (20011001), Database accession no. Q97UI4, URL: EBI, XP002627736 [X] 7 * compound . * | International search | [A] - UNIPROTKB/TREMBL Q9JRQ1, (20001001), URL: http:/lwww.uniprot.org/uniprot/Q9JRQ1 |