EP2245041 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING JUVENILE RENAL DYSPLASIA OR CALCIUM OXALATE STONES IN DOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dogenes Inc. 161 Sherin Avenue Peterborough, Ontario K9J 7V5 / CA | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITELEY, Mary Helen 161 Sherin Avenue Peterborough Ontario K9J 7V5 / CA | [2015/37] |
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
WHITELEY, Mary, Helen 161 Sherin Avenue Peterborough Ontario K9J 7V5 / CA | Representative(s) | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2010/44] | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09703897.0 | 22.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009CA00102 | Priority number, date | US20080011581P | 22.01.2008 Original published format: US 11581 P | US20080133242P | 27.06.2008 Original published format: US 133242 P | [2015/16] |
Former [2010/44] | US20080011581 | 22.01.2008 | |
US20080133242 | 27.06.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009092171 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245041 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245041 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, A01K67/02, C07H21/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/68, C12N15/11, C12N15/53, C12N9/02 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/124 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2333/90274 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2010/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON JUVENILER NEPHROPATHIE ODER CALCIUMOXALATSTEINEN BEI HUNDEN | [2010/44] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING JUVENILE RENAL DYSPLASIA OR CALCIUM OXALATE STONES IN DOGS | [2010/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION D'UNE DYSPLASIE RÉNALE JUVÉNILE OU DE CALCULS D'OXALATE DE CALCIUM CHEZ LES CHIENS | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 08.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2009 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | IT | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | IE | 22.01.2016 | LU | 22.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | FR | 01.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.01.2009 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.01.2009 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.01.2009 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "Human C-reactive protein (CRP) associated marker DNA SEQ ID NO 1046.", Geneseq, (20060126), Database accession no. AED96834, URL: EBI, XP002670786 [X] 12 * sequence . * | [Y] - Kenneth C. Bovee, "Renal Dysplasia in Shih Tzu Dogs", (20031024), The 28th Congress of the World Small Animal Veterinary Association Proceedings Online, URL: http://www.vin.com/proceedings/Proceedings.plx?CID=WSAVA2003&PID=6602&O=Generic, (20120302), XP002670787 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - Sue Thatcher, "*Update* The RD test is now available see www.dogenes.com for details", (20061105), URL: http://www.bakalo.com/health/RD.htm, (20120305), XP002670788 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - DINCHUK J E ET AL, "RENAL ABNORMALITIES AND AN ALTERED INFLAMMATORY RESPONSE IN MICE LACKING CYCLOOXYGENASE II", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (19951101), vol. 378, doi:10.1038/378406A0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 406 - 409, XP002918292 [Y] 1-15 * page 407, column r, lines 10-13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/378406a0 | [A] - G. S. SELLICK, "Genomewide linkage searches for Mendelian disease loci can be efficiently conducted using high-density SNP genotyping arrays", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20041116), vol. 32, no. 20, doi:10.1093/nar/gnh163, pages E164 - E164, XP055020809 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gnh163 | [A] - S. ROSSETTI ET AL, "Genotype-Phenotype Correlations in Autosomal Dominant and Autosomal Recessive Polycystic Kidney Disease", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, (20070411), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1681/ASN.2007010125, ISSN 1046-6673, pages 1374 - 1380, XP055020810 [A] 1-15 * page 1375, column l, paragraphs 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2007010125 | [A] - "Canis familiaris cyclooxygenase 2 (COX-2) gene, promoter region and 5' UTR.", EMBL, (20060302), Database accession no. AY927786, URL: EBI, XP002670789 [A] 1-15 * sequence . * | [XP] - Dr. Mary H. Whiteley, "JUVENILE RENAL DYSPLASIA (JRD) DNA TESTING", (20080517), URL: http://www.gsdhelp.info/renal/jrdtesting.html, (20120305), XP002670790 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [T] - MARY H. WHITELEY ET AL, "Novel Allelic Variants in the Canine Cyclooxgenase-2 (Cox-2) Promoter Are Associated with Renal Dysplasia in Dogs", PLOS ONE, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0016684, ISSN 1932-6203, pages E16684 - E16684, XP055020801 [T] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0016684 | International search | [X]WO0111026 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al); | [A]US2006149048 (WISNEWSKI NANCY [US], et al); | [A] - SIMMONS, D. L. ET AL., "Cyclooxygenase Isozymes: The Biology of Prostaglandin Synthesis and Inhibition.", PHARMACOL. REV., (2004), vol. 56, pages 387 - 437, XP008138922 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/pr.56.3.3 | [A] - PEETERS, D. ET AL., "Juvenile Nephropathy in a Boxer, a Rottweiler, a Collie and an Irish Wolfhound.", AUST. VET. J., (200003), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 162 - 165, XP008138924 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-0813.2000.tb10584.x | [A] - BREYER, M. D. ET AL., "Cyclooxygenase 2 and the Kidney.", CURR. OPIN. NEPHROL. HYPERTENSION, (2001), vol. 10, pages 89 - 98, XP008138925 | by applicant | US5034506 | US4598049 | US4458066 | US4401796 | US4373071 | US4863195 | US4683202 | US7476524 | - PEETERS D; CLERCX C; MICHIELS L; DESMECHT D; SNAPS F; HENROTEAUX M; DAY MJ., AUST. VET J., (2000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 162 - 165 | - KRUGER, J.M.; OSBORNE, C.A. ET AL., Congenital and Hereditary Disorders of the Kidney; Veterinary Pediatrics Dogs & Cats from Birth to Six Months, W.B.SAUNDERS, (1995), pages 401 - 406 | - ABRAHAM LA; BECK C; SLOCOMBE RF, VET J., (2003), vol. 81, no. 6, pages 336 - 9 | - PEETERS D; CLERCX C; MICHIELS L; DESMECHT D; SNAPS F; HENROTEAUX M; DAY MJ., AUST VET J., (2000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 162 - 165 | - HOPPE A; KARLSTAM E., J SMALL ANIM PRACT., (2000), vol. 41, no. 9, pages 422 - 6 | - OLENICK CL., CAN VET J., (1999), vol. 40, no. 6, pages 425 - 6 | - SCHULZE C; MEYER HP; BLOK AL; SCHIPPER K; VAN DEN INGH TS., VET Q., (1998), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 146 - 8 | - ROELS S; SCHOOFS S; DUCATELLE R., SMALL ANIM PRACT., (1997), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 115 - 8 | - LOBETTI RG; PEARSON J; JIMENEZ M, J SMALL ANIM PRACT., (1996), vol. 37, no. 11, pages 552 - 5 | - KERLIN RL; VAN WINKLE T, J. VET PATHOL., (1995), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 327 - 9 | - VILAFRANCA M; FERRER L., VET PATHOL., (1994), pages 375 - 7 | - MORTON LD; SANECKI RK; GORDON DE; SOPIARZ RL; BELL JS; SAKAS PS., VET PATHOL., (1990), pages 455 - 8 | - BOOTH K., VET REC., (1990), vol. 127, no. 24, pages 596 - 7 | - NASH AS; CRESWICK JA., VET REC., (1988), vol. 123, no. 25, pages 654 - 5 | - ROBINSON WF; HUXTABLE CR; GOODING JP, AUST VET J., (1985), vol. 62, no. 4, pages 109 - 12 | - MANDERINO DM; DEVRIES JG; TAMARKIN J., MOD VET PRACT., (1984), vol. 65, no. 8, pages 633 - 5 | - DIBARTOLA SP; CHEW DJ; BOYCE JT., J AM VET MED ASSOC., (1983), vol. 183, no. 6, pages 693 - 6 | - O'BRIEN TD; OSBORNE CA; YANO BL; BARNES DM., J AM VET MED ASSOC., (1982), vol. 180, no. 6, pages 658 - 64 | - PICUT CA; LEWIS RM, VET PATHOL., (1987), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 156 - 63 | - HLA, T.; NEILSON, K., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 89, pages 7384 - 7388 | - TAZAWA, R.; XU, X.-M.; WU, K. K.; WANG, L.-H., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1994), vol. 203, pages 190 - 1999 | - YU Y; FAN J; CHEN XS; WANG D; KLEIN-SZANTO AJ; CAMPBELL RL; FITZGERALD GA; FUNK CD., NAT MED., (200606), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 699 - 704 | - DINCHUK JE; CAR BD; FOCHT RJ; JOHNSTON JJ; JAFFEE BD; COVINGTON MB; CONTEL NR; ENG VM; COLLINS RJ; CZERNIAK PM ET AL., NATURE, (199501), vol. 378, no. 6555, pages 406 - 409 | - CUSHWA; MEDRANO, ANIMAL BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 7, pages 11 - 31 | - P.E. NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, page 1497 | - ALTSCHUL, S.F.; GISH, W.; MILLER, W.; MYERS, E.W.; LIPMAN, D.J., "Basic local alignment search tool", J. MOL. BIOI., (1990), vol. 215, page 403410 | - "Identification of protein coding regions by database similarity search", NATURE GENET., (1993), vol. 3, page 266272 | - MADDEN, T.L.; TATUSOV, R.L.; ZHANG, J., "Applications of network BLAST server", METH. ENZYMOL., (1996), vol. 266, pages 131 - 141 | - ALTSCHUL, S.F.; MADDEN, T.L.; SCHAFFER, A.A.; ZHANG, J.; ZHANG, Z.; MILLER, W.; LIPMAN, D.J., "Gapped BLAST and PSI_BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page 33893402 | - ZHANG, J.; MADDEN, T.L., "PowerBLAST: A new network BLAST application for interactive or automated sequence analysis and annotation", GENOME RES., (1997), vol. 7, page 649656 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6 | - MANIATIS, T. ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1982), pages 387 - 389 | - SAMBROOK J. ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 2, pages 8.46 - 8.47 | - CHIRGWIN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, page 5294 5299 | - PICUT,CA; RM LEWIS, VET PATHOL., (1987), vol. 24, pages 156 - 163 | - BYONG CHANG JEONG; MIN YOUNG PARK; KWAK CHEOL; BONG SUB KIM; KIM JUNG-IN; HYEON HOE KIM, UROLOGICAL RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 33, no. 6, pages 453 - 459 | - TYAGI S; KRAMER FR, "Molecular beacons: probes that fluoresce upon hybridization", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 14, pages 303 - 308 | - GOOD ET AL., NUCL. ACID RES, (1977), vol. 4, page 2157 | - CONOLLY, B.A., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19861215), vol. 15, no. 7, page 3131 | - M.A. INNIS; D.H. GELFAND, PCR Protocols, A Guide to Methods and Applications, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1989), pages 3 - 12 | - M.A. INNIS; D.H. GELFAND, PCR Protocols, A guide to Methods and Applications, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1989), pages 3 - 12 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOL.TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL, (1986), vol. 121, pages 140 - 67 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, page 1275 | - "Assessment of Cyclooxygenase-2 Expression in Canine Hemangiosarcoma, Histiocytic Sarcoma, and Mast Cell Tumor", D. A. HELLER; C. A. CLIFFORD; M. H. GOLDSCHMIDT; D. E. HOLT; M. J. MANFREDI; K. U. SORENMO, Vet Pathol, (2005), vol. 42, pages 350 - 353 |