EP2238449 - METHOD FOR DISCRIMINATING BETWEEN MALIGNANT AND BENIGN TISSUE LESIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balter, Inc. 465 Ridgewood Road Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAMNES, Jakob, J. Kvernkallveien 12A 0382 Oslo / NO | 02 /
STAMNES, Knut 465 Ridgewood Road Maplewood NJ 07040 / US | 03 /
RYZHIKOV, Gennady Vestre Vadmyra 35 5172 Loddefjord / NO | 04 /
BIRYULINA, Marina Vestre Vadmyra 35 5172 Loddefjord / NO | 05 /
HAMRE, Boerge Aurdalslia 127 5253 Sandsli / NO | 06 /
SOMMERSTEN, Endre, R. Skjoldber 31 5283 Radal / NO | 07 /
ZHAO, Lu Vestre Fantoftaasen 44 5072 Bergen / NO | [2018/23] |
Former [2012/25] | 01 /
STAMNES, Jakob, J. Kvernkallveien 12A N-0382 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
STAMNES, Knut 465 Ridgewood Road Maplewood NJ 07040 / US | |||
03 /
RYZHIKOV, Gennady Vestre Vadmyra 35 N-5172 Loddefjord / NO | |||
04 /
BIRYULINA, Marina Vestre Vadmyra 35 N-5172 Loddefjord / NO | |||
05 /
HAMRE, Boerge Aurdalslia 127 N-5253 Sandsli / NO | |||
06 /
SOMMERSTEN, Endre, R. Skjoldber 31 N-5283 Radal / NO | |||
07 /
ZHAO, Lu Vestre Fantoftaasen 44 5072 Bergen / NO | |||
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
STAMNES, Jakob, J. Kvernkallveien 12A N-0382 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
STAMNES, Knut 465 Ridgewood Road Maplewood NJ 07040 / US | |||
03 /
RYZHIKOV, Gennady Vestre Vadmyra 35 N-5172 Loddefjord / NO | |||
04 /
BIRYULINA, Marina Vestre Vadmyra 35 N-5172 Loddefjord / NO | |||
05 /
HAMRE, Boerge Aurdalslia 127 N-5253 Sandsli / NO | |||
06 /
SOMMERSTEN, Endre, R. Skjoldber 31 N-5283 Radal / NO | |||
07 /
ZHAO, Lu Fantoft studentboliger 5075 Bergen / NO | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09703925.9 | 26.01.2009 | [2010/41] | WO2009US31969 | Priority number, date | US20080023242P | 24.01.2008 Original published format: US 23242 P | US20080037503P | 18.03.2008 Original published format: US 37503 P | [2018/11] |
Former [2010/41] | US20080023242 | 24.01.2008 | |
US20080037503 | 18.03.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009094623 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2238449 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2238449 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/444 (EP,US);
A61B5/0075 (US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,US);
A61B5/1079 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/44 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20036 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30088 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | G01N33/483, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2010/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG ZWISCHEN GUTARTIGEN UND BÖSARTIGEN GEWEBELÄSIONEN | [2010/41] | English: | METHOD FOR DISCRIMINATING BETWEEN MALIGNANT AND BENIGN TISSUE LESIONS | [2010/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE LA DISTINCTION ENTRE DES LÉSIONS TISSULAIRES MALIGNES ET BÉNIGNES | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 28.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2009 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | LU | 26.01.2019 | MT | 26.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.01.2009 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
MT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
MT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007020643 (PASSIVE IMAGING MEDICAL SYSTEM [IL], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1 - page 8 *; | [A] - M Moncrieff ET AL, "Spectrophotometric intracutaneous analysis: a new technique for imaging pigmented skin lesions", British Journal of Dermatology, (20010912), pages 448 - 457, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1046/j.1365-2133.2002.04569.x/pdf, (20120704), XP055031776 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.2002.04569.x | [A] - CARRARA M ET AL, "Multispectral imaging and artificial neural network: mimicking the management decision of the clinician facing pigmented skin lesions; Multispectral imaging and neural network on pigmented skin lesions", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS LTD. LONDON, GB, (20070507), vol. 52, no. 9, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/52/9/018, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 2599 - 2613, XP020113316 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/52/9/018 | [A] - A. BLUM ET AL, "Digital image analysis for diagnosis of cutaneous melanoma. Development of a highly effective computer algorithm based on analysis of 837 melanocytic lesions", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (20041101), vol. 151, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2133.2004.06210.x, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 1029 - 1038, XP055031805 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2133.2004.06210.x | [A] - GUTKOWICZ-KRUSIN D; ELBAUM M; JACOBS A; KEEM S; KOPF A W; KAMINO H; WANG S; RUBIN P; RABINOVITZ H; OLIVIERO M, "PRECISION OF AUTOMATIC MEASUREMENTS OF PIGMENTED SKIN LESION PARAMETERS WITH A MELAFIND(TM) MULTISPECTRAL DIGITAL DERMOSCOPE", MELANOMA RESEARCH., XX, (20001201), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 563 - 570, XP008078685 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - MONCRIEFF ET AL, "Spectrophotometric intracutaneous analysis: a new technique for imaging pigmented skin lesions.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (20020301), vol. 146, no. 3, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 448 - 457, XP055031810 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.2002.04569.x | International search | [A]WO0227660 (MARCONI MEDICAL SYS INC [US]); | [A]WO2006076810 (PERCEPTRONIX MEDICAL INC [CA], et al); | [A] - RALLAN, DEEPAK ET AL., "Quantitative Discrimination of Pigmented Lesions Using Three- Dimensional High-Resolution Ultrasound Reflex Transmission Imaging.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY., (200610), vol. 127, pages 189 - 195, XP008138447 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jid.5700554 | [A] - HANNEN, EGIED J. M. ET AL., "An Image Analysis Study on Nuclear Morphology in Metastasized and Non-metastasized Squamous Cell Carcinomas of the Tongue.", JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY., (1998), vol. 185, pages 175 - 183, XP001071004 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9896(199806)185:2<175::AID-PATH69>3.0.CO;2-U | by applicant | WO2007020643 | - MONCRIEFF ET AL., "Spectrophotometric intracutaneous analysis: a new technique for imaging pigmented skin lesions", BRISITCH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (20010912), doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-2133.2002.04569.x, pages 448 - 457, XP055031776 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.2002.04569.x | - "Multispectral imaging and artificial neural network: mimicking the management decision of the clinician facing pigmented skin lesions, Multispectral imaging and neural network on pigmented skin lesion", CARRARA M ET AL., PHYSICS IN MEDICIIIN AND BIOLOGY, TAYLOR AND GRANCIS LTD., (20070507), vol. 52, pages 2599 - 2613 |