EP2247465 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR AUTOMATED VEHICLE SPEED CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL ALAM, Assad Åsgärdevägen 8 BV S-121 31 Enskededalen / SE | 02 /
ANDERSSON, Jon Erikshällsgatan 35 S-151 46 Södertälje / SE | 03 /
SAHLHOLM, Per Silvergransvägen 16 S-141 45 Huddinge / SE | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
AL ALAM, Assad Asgardevagen 8 BV S-121 31 Enskededalen / SE | ||
02 /
ANDERSSON, Jon Erikshällsgatan 35 S-151 46 Södertälje / SE | |||
03 /
SAHLHOLM, Per Silvergransvägen 16 S-141 45 Huddinge / SE | |||
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
AL ALAM, Assad Starrvägen 5A S-645 44 Strängnäs / SE | ||
02 /
ANDERSSON, Jon Erikshällsgatan 35 S-151 46 Södertälje / SE | |||
03 /
SAHLHOLM, Per Silvergransvägen 16 S-141 45 Huddinge / SE | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09705056.1 | 15.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009SE50030 | Priority number, date | SE20080000201 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: SE 0800201 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009096882 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2247465 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247465 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00, B60T7/12, G08G1/0967, B60W30/14, B60W50/00, B60T7/18 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
B60W50/0098 (EP);
B60K31/0058 (SE);
B60T7/12 (SE);
B60T7/18 (EP);
B60W30/143 (EP);
B60W50/0097 (EP);
G08G1/096708 (SE);
B60W2555/60 (EP);
B60W2556/50 (EP);
B60W2720/103 (EP);
B60W2720/106 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP);
Y02T10/84 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | B60W50/00, B60T7/18, B60K31/00, B60T7/12, B60W30/14 | ||
Former IPC [2011/04] | B60K31/00, B60T7/12, G08G1/0967, B60W30/14 | ||
Former IPC [2010/45] | B60K31/00, B60T7/12, G08G1/0967 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT FÜR AUTOMATISIERTE FAHRZEUGGESCHWINDIGKEITSKONTROLLE | [2010/45] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR AUTOMATED VEHICLE SPEED CONTROL | [2010/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR COMMANDE DE VITESSE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMATISÉE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 28.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2009 | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | IE | 15.01.2013 | LU | 15.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 15.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 15.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 15.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1134137 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US2002022920 (STRAUB MICHAEL P [US]); | [A]US2002087254 (RYOO NAM-KYOO [KR]); | [A]EP1693242 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2006290202 (SHIBATA YUMI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]DE3127425 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]US2002087254 (RYOO NAM-KYOO [KR]); | [A]DE10258167 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]); | [A]FR2861882 (AVER STEPHANE [FR], et al); | [A]US2007050130 (GRIMM DONALD K [US], et al) |