EP2245751 - METHOD OF SPATIO-TEMPORAL CODING WITH LOW PAPR FOR MULTI-ANTENNA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM OF PULSE UWB TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOU RJEILY, Chadi Lebanese American University Faculty of Engeneering and Architecture P.O. Box 36 Byblos / LB | [2011/52] |
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
ABOU RJEILY, Chadi Lebanese American University Faculty of Engeneering and Architecture P.O. Box 36 Byblos / LB | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2010/44] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09705285.6 | 29.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009EP50986 | Priority number, date | FR20080050598 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850598 | [2010/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095430 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245751 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245751 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/69, H04L1/06 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
H04L1/0643 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/7176 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/717 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÄUMLICH-ZEITLICHEN CODIERUNG MIT NIEDRIGEN PAPR FÜR EIN MEHRANTENNEN-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DES IMPULS-UWB-TYPS | [2010/44] | English: | METHOD OF SPATIO-TEMPORAL CODING WITH LOW PAPR FOR MULTI-ANTENNA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM OF PULSE UWB TYPE | [2010/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE SPATIO-TEMPOREL À FAIBLE PAPR POUR SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MULTI-ANTENNE DE TYPE UWB IMPULSIONNEL | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 28.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2009 | AT | 28.12.2011 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | HR | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | MK | 28.12.2011 | MT | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | LU | 29.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 28.03.2012 | NO | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LU | 29.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
MK | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
HR | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
NO | 28.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X] - ABOU-RJEILY C ET AL, "On Space-Time Coding With Pulse Position and Amplitude Modulations for Time-Hopping Ultra-Wideband Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE, US, (20070701), vol. 53, no. 7, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 2490 - 2509, XP011186163 [X] 1-12 * page 2490 * * III. Construction 1. * * IV. Construction 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2007.899472 | [AD] - RAJAN B S ET AL, "Full-diversity, high-rate space-time block codes from division algebras", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE, US, (20031001), vol. 49, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 2596 - 2616, XP011102239 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2003.817831 |