EP2240092 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ANCHORING A GASTROENTEROLOGIC SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gagner, Michel 305 Rue de la Commune Ouest, Suite 45 Montreal, QC H2Y 2E1 / CA | [2017/06] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states Medical and Surgical Review, P.C. 305 Rue de la Commune Ouest, Suite 45 Montreal, QC H2Y 2E1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGNER, Michel 305 Rue de la Commune Ouest, Suite 45 Montreal, QC H2Y 2E1 / CA | 02 /
BLAESER, David, J. 10813 Major Avenue North Brooklyn Park MN 55443 / US | 03 /
SPENCER, Dale, A. 503 Ferndale Road North Wayzata MN 55391 / US | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | KIPA Krahbichler Intellectual Property Advisors AB P.O. Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2010/42] | Krahbichler, Erik Krahbichler Intellectual Property Advisors AB (Kipa AB) P O Box 1065 S-251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 09706642.7 | 30.01.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009US32737 | Priority number, date | US20080025500P | 01.02.2008 Original published format: US 25500 P | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009097582 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240092 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/04, // A61F5/00, A61B17/00 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00818 (EP,US);
A61F2002/041 (EP,US);
A61F2002/045 (EP,US);
A61F5/0076 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/42] | A61B17/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERANKERUNG EINER GASTROENTEROLOGISCHEN HÜLSE | [2010/42] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ANCHORING A GASTROENTEROLOGIC SLEEVE | [2010/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'ANCRAGE D'UN MANCHON GASTRO-ENTÉROLOGIQUE | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 03.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 19.05.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 08.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03086507 (KIM JAE HWANG [KR]) [A] 14-16* page 6, line 17 - page 8, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2006064120 (LEVINE ANDY H [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0058]; figure 7 * [I] 16; | [X]WO2006102240 (EGAN THOMAS D [US], et al) [X] 14-16 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046]; figures 3,4 * | International search | [Y]US4592339 (KUZMAK LUBOMYR I [US], et al); | [Y]US6755869 (GEITZ KURT [US]); | [X]US7314489 (MCKENNA ROBERT HUGH [US], et al) | Examination | US2003040804 | by applicant | US2003040804 |