EP2238798 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BURST SEPARATION AND EXTENDED INTERLEAVING LENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VESMA, Jussi Sahurintie 3 FIN-20320 Turku / FI | 02 /
PEKONEN, Harri Upalingontie 64 FIN-21260 Raisio / FI | 03 /
HIMMANEN, Heidi Karjalankatu 2B 8 FI-20740 Turku / FI | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2010/41] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria, et al Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department PO Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 09706902.5 | 13.01.2009 | [2010/41] | WO2009FI00015 | Priority number, date | US20080024481P | 29.01.2008 Original published format: US 24481 P | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095527 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2238798 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2238798 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/00, H04J4/00, H04H20/72, H04L27/26, H04H20/33, H04L5/00, H04H20/30, H04B7/26 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
H04L27/2607 (EP,US);
H04B7/2625 (EP,US);
H04H20/30 (EP,US);
H04H20/33 (EP,US);
H04H20/72 (EP,US);
H04J4/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | H04W72/00, H04J4/00, H04H20/72, H04L27/26, H04H20/33, H04L5/00, H04H20/30 | ||
Former IPC [2010/41] | H04W72/00, H04J4/00, H04H20/72, H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2010/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR BURST-TRENNUNG UND ERHÖHTE VERSCHACHTELUNGSLÄNGE | [2010/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BURST SEPARATION AND EXTENDED INTERLEAVING LENGTH | [2010/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE SALVES ET LONGUEUR D'ENTRELACEMENT ÉTENDUE | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 20.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2009 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | PT | 17.09.2018 | IE | 13.01.2019 | LU | 13.01.2019 | MT | 13.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.01.2009 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CY | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 13.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 16.05.2018 | |
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 16.05.2018 | |
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 16.05.2018 | |
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 16.05.2018 | |
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 16.05.2018 | |
NO | 16.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6094425 (AUGER GERARD [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 50 - line 67 * * column 3, line 1 - line 23 *; | [X]US2003157943 (SABAT JOHN [US]) [X] 9-15 * abstract * * claims 1, 21 * * paragraph [0035] * * figure 7 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] *; | [Y]WO2005109705 (WALTICAL SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]EP1643690 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 9-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] * * figure 5 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] ** paragraph [0078] * | International search | [A]US6094425 (AUGER GERARD [FR], et al); | [X]EP1404144 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [X]WO2007002270 (ATC TECH LLC [US], et al); | [A]US2007277077 (VESMA JUSSI [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2008110886 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2008149263 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [E]US2009067384 (HIMMANEN HEIDI [FI], et al); | [E]WO2009040752 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [E]US2009097446 (PEKONEN HARRI J [FI], et al) | by applicant | US6094425 | US2003157943 | WO2005109705 |