EP2243126 - SYSTEM FOR SENSING ROAD AND TRAFFIC CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PADMANABHAN, Venkata, N. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA International Patents Department One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
RAMJEE, Ramachandran c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA International Patents Department One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MOHAN, Prashanth c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA International Patents Department One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2018/36] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
PADMANABHAN, Venkata, N. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA International Patents Department One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
RAMJEE, Ramachandran c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA International Patents Department One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
MOHAN, Prashanth c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA International Patents Department One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/36] |
Former [2010/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09707913.1 | 02.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US30028 | Priority number, date | US20080024798P | 30.01.2008 Original published format: US 24798 P | US20080147438 | 26.06.2008 Original published format: US 147438 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009099680 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243126 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2243126 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
G08G1/0104 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | G08G1/052, G08G1/0967 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/36] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG VON STRASSEN- UND VERKEHRSBEDINGUNGEN | [2010/43] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SENSING ROAD AND TRAFFIC CONDITIONS | [2010/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE CONDITIONS DE ROUTE ET DE TRAFIC | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 03.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.01.2009 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IE | 02.01.2019 | LU | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.01.2009 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IE | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.01.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | ES | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0017607 (MAGELLAN DIS INC [US]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [A]WO0218873 (MAGELLAN DIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005080566 (VOCK CURTIS A [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0271] * * paragraph [0295] - paragraph [0298] *; | [Y]WO2006073475 (GUARDIAN GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US], et al) [Y] 1,15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figures 9,10 *; | [Y] - BYCHKOVSKY V ET AL, "The CarTel Mobile Sensor Computing System", SENSYS'06: PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMBEDDED NETWORKED SENSOR SYSTEMS 1-3 NOVEMBER 2006 ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, New York, USA, (20061101), doi:10.1145/1182807.1182866, ISBN 1-59593-343-3, pages 383 - 384, XP040051855 [Y] 1,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1182807.1182866 | [A] - HULL B ET AL, "CarTel: A distributed mobile sensor computing system", SENSYS'06: PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMBEDDED NETWORKED SENSOR SYSTEMS 1-3 NOVEMER 2006 ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, New York, USA, (20061101), doi:10.1145/1182807.1182821, ISBN 1-59593-343-3, pages 125 - 138, XP040051815 [A] 1,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1182807.1182821 | [A] - BYCHKOVSKY V ET AL, "Data management in the CarTel mobile sensor computing system", SIGMOD 2006 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA 27-29 JUNE 2006, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, New York, USA, (20060627), doi:10.1145/1142473.1142569, ISBN 1-59593-256-9, pages 730 - 732, XP040042491 [A] 1,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1142473.1142569 | [A] - FURRER S ET AL, "The IBM Wireless Sensor Networking Testbed", TESTBEDS AND RESEARCH INFRASTRUCTURES FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF NETWORKS AND COMMUNITIES, 2006. TRIDENTCOM 2006. 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE O N BARCELONA, SPAIN MARCH 1-3, 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060301), doi:10.1109/TRIDNT.2006.1649126, ISBN 978-1-4244-0106-2, pages 42 - 46, XP010924284 [A] 1,15 * paragraph [02.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRIDNT.2006.1649126 | International search | [A]JP2004287724 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]KR20050089419 (NEXMORE SYSTEMS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20060072933 (CONTELA LTD [KR]) | by applicant | WO0017607 | WO0218873 | US2005080566 | KR20060072933 | WO2006073475 | - "The CarTel Mobile Sensor Computing System", BYCHKOVSKY V ET AL., SENSYS'06: Proceedings of the Fourth International Conference on Embedded Networked Sensor Systems, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, (20061101), pages 383 - 384 | - "Cartel: A Distributed Mobile Sensor Computing System", HULL B ET AL., Sensys'06: Proceedings of the Fourth International Conference on Embedded Networked Sensor Systems, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, (20061101), pages 125 - 138 | - "Data management in the CarTel mobile sensor computing system", BYCHKOVSKY V ET AL., SIGMOD 2006 - Proceedings of the ACM Sigmod International Conference on Management of Data, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, (20060627), pages 730 - 732 | - FURRER S ET AL., "The IBM Wireless Sensor Networking Testbed", TESTBEDS AND RESEARCH INFRASTRUCTURES FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF NETWORKS AND COMMUNITIES, (20060301), doi:doi:10.1109/TRIDNT.2006.1649126, pages 42 - 46, XP010924284 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRIDNT.2006.1649126 |