EP2242407 - DEVICE FOR PREPARING DRINKS AND METHOD FOR CLEANING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toeca International Company B.V. Grebbeweg 111 3911 AV Rhenen / NL | [2014/18] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Toeca International Company B.V. Hoge Mosten 22A 4822 NH Breda / NL | ||
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Toeca International Company B.V. Groningensingel 1, etage 10 6835 EA Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOEKHOORN, Marcel, Martinus, Jacobus, Johannes Bovenweg 31 NL-6721 HV Bennekom / NL | 02 /
ARNS, Maarten Panhuis 26 NL-6603 KE Wijchen / NL | 03 /
SCHIPPERS, Harry Europaring 238 NL-7641 DG Wierden / NL | [2011/31] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
BOEKHOORN, Marcel, Martinus, Jacobus, Johannes Bovenweg 31 NL-6721 HV Bennekom / NL | ||
02 /
ARNS, Maarten Daalseweg 199 NL-6521 GH Nijmegen / NL | |||
03 /
SCHIPPERS, Harry Europaring 238 NL-7641 DG Wierden / NL | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Langenhuijsen, Bastiaan Wilhelmus Herman Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 09707967.7 | 06.02.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009NL50054 | Priority number, date | WO2008NL50068 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: PCT/NL2008/050068 | NL20082001873 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: NL 2001873 | [2010/43] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009099330 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242407 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/60, B67D1/07, B08B9/032, F25D3/10, F25D31/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
A47J31/402 (EP,US);
A47J31/60 (EP,US);
B08B9/0321 (EP,US);
B08B9/0323 (EP,US);
B08B9/0325 (EP,US);
F25C2400/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ZUBEREITUNG VON GETRÄNKEN UND REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DERARTIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2010/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR PREPARING DRINKS AND METHOD FOR CLEANING SUCH A DEVICE | [2010/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 18.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 04.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XIY]WO2006090183 (COFFEE NATION LTD [GB]; MARTIN SCOTT [GB]; IRWIN STEVE JAMES [GB]; YAU) [X] 1-3,14,15,17-20,25,26,28-30,32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0126] , [0141] , [0142] , [0144] * [I] 22,27 [Y] 4,5; | [Y]JPH10134246 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * |