EP2238516 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SECURITY ELEMENTS BY INDIVIDUALIZATION OF VOLUME HOLOGRAMS AND SECURITY ELEMENTS PRODUCED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/41] | METHOD FOR THE INDIVIDUALIZATION OF VOLUME HOLOGRAMS AND SECURITY ELEMENTS PRODUCED THEREWITH | ||
[2011/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hologram Industries Research GmbH Melchior-Huber-Strasse 25 85652 Pliening-Ottersberg / DE | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENZ, Irina Winklerring 43 85630 Grasbrunn / DE | 02 /
HUET, Philippe 66 rue Carnot 91700 Saint Geneviève des Bois / FR | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Farago-Schauer, Peter Andreas, et al Farago Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Farago, Peter Andreas, et al Kanzlei Schieber - Farago Patentanwälte Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09708767.0 | 04.02.2009 | [2010/41] | WO2009DE00147 | Priority number, date | DE20081007620 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008007620 | [2010/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009097838 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2238516 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2238516 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/18, B42D15/10, // B42D15/00 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
G03H1/18 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
G03H1/0256 (EP,US);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/47 (EP,US);
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
G03H1/0236 (EP,US);
G03H1/0248 (EP,US);
G03H2001/186 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2231 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2263 (EP,US);
G03H2210/54 (EP,US);
G03H2250/35 (EP,US);
G03H2250/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | G03H1/18, B42D15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SICHERHEITSELEMENTEN DURCH INDIVIDUALISIERUNG VON VOLUMENHOLOGRAMMEN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE SICHERHEITSELEMENTE | [2011/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SECURITY ELEMENTS BY INDIVIDUALIZATION OF VOLUME HOLOGRAMS AND SECURITY ELEMENTS PRODUCED THEREWITH | [2011/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DES ÉLÉMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ PAR INDIVIDUALISATION D'HOLOGRAMMES VOLUMIQUES ET ÉLÉMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ AINSI FABRIQUÉS | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/41] | VERFAHREN ZUR INDIVIDUALISIERUNG VON VOLUMENHOLOGRAMMEN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE SICHERHEITSELEMENTE | ||
Former [2010/41] | METHOD FOR THE INDIVIDUALIZATION OF VOLUME HOLOGRAMS AND SECURITY ELEMENTS PRODUCED THEREWITH | ||
Former [2010/41] | PROCÉDÉ D'INDIVIDUALISATION D'HOLOGRAMMES VOLUMIQUES ET ÉLÉMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ COMPOSÉS DE CES HOLOGRAMMES | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 13.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2009 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | HR | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | MK | 25.04.2012 | MT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | NO | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | |
NO | 25.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5856048 (TAHARA SHIGEHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 29, line 34 - column 30, line 33; figure 23 *; | [A]WO2005091085 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 31 - page 5, line 6 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 35 * * page 10, line 9 - line 17; figures 3-8 *; | [DX]WO2007131496 (HOLOGRAM IND RES GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-9,11 * page 2, line 27 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 4 - line 9 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 3; figures 1-4; claims 1-11 *; | [T]GB2452066 (VER TEC SECURITY SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [T] 1-11 * page 3, line 23 - line 24 * * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 4; figures 2-4 *; | [A] - RUDOLF L. VAN RENESSE, Optical Document Security, BOSTON LONDON, ARTECH HOUSE, (2005), XP002529816 [A] 2-6 * page 115 - page 127 * |