EP2240753 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TESTING OF TRANSDUCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. P.O. Box 482 Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROMAN, Gary 4124 Hildring Drive East Fort Worth TX 76109 / US | 02 /
HALE, Keith 704 Country Club Drive Joshua TX 76058 / US | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2015/01] |
Former [2012/07] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/42] | Lecomte, Didier Lecomte & Partners Sàrl B.P. 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 09708876.9 | 29.01.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009US32381 | Priority number, date | US20080025978 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: US 25978 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009099878 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240753 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2240753 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01M7/02, G01P21/00, G01P21/02, G01C25/00 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
G01M7/025 (EP,US);
G01P21/00 (EP,US);
G01P21/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/42] | G01M7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN VON WANDLERN | [2010/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TESTING OF TRANSDUCERS | [2010/42] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D ESSAI DE TRANSDUCTEURS | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 05.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2009 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | HR | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MK | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | IE | 29.01.2015 | LU | 29.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | NO | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | PT | 01.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.01.2009 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
PT | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3830091 (SINSKY J) [A] 1-20* column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 34; figure . *; | [A]US5895858 (MALONE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 5, lines 29-35 * * column 6, lines 16-23 * * column 7, lines 26-47; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2001108517 (YAMATAKE CORP, et al) [A] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0007] - [0010] - [1421] - [0029]; figures 1,2,6,7,8 * | International search | [Y]US3416052 (RUSSELL GEORGE K, et al); | [Y]US3456484 (SCHWARTZ JOSEPH I); | [Y]US3830091 (SINSKY J); | [Y]US4392127 (STEELE DEREK E [AU]); | [Y]US5265131 (SCAROLA KENNETH [US], et al); | [Y]US5659143 (ISACKSON NADENE S [US]); | [Y]US6509565 (NYGARD EINAR [NO], et al) | by applicant | US2830091 | US5895858 | JP2001108517 |