EP2252809 - EPICYCLIC GEAR SYSTEM HAVING TWO ARRAYS OF PINIONS MOUNTED ON FLEXPINS WITH COMPENSATION FOR CARRIER DISTORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Timken Company 1835 Dueber Avenue S.W. Canton, OH 44706-0930 / US | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Gerald, P. 5715 Old Bridge Massillon Ohio 44706 / US | 02 /
KRUSE, Randy, P. 1510 Radford Street NE North Canton Ohio 44720 / US | 03 /
SUCHANEK, Jaroslav Rozprymova 980 66453 Ujezd U Brna / CZ | 04 /
MALEC, Milos Chobutky 459 59501 Velka Bites / CZ | 05 /
MALOOF, James 765 Yager Road Clinton Ohio 44216 / US | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [2016/02] |
Former [2010/47] | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09709844.6 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009US33896 | Priority number, date | US20080028274 | 13.02.2008 Original published format: US 28274 | US20080125715 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: US 125715 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009102853 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252809 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252809 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/28 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
F16H1/2836 (EP,CN,US);
F16H1/32 (CN);
F16H57/082 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2001/325 (CN);
F16H2001/327 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2010/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PLANETENGETRIEBE MIT ZWEI ANORDNUNGEN VON AUF FLEXPINS MONTIERTEN RITZELN MIT AUSGLEICH FÜR TRÄGERVERFORMUNG | [2010/47] | English: | EPICYCLIC GEAR SYSTEM HAVING TWO ARRAYS OF PINIONS MOUNTED ON FLEXPINS WITH COMPENSATION FOR CARRIER DISTORTION | [2010/47] | French: | TRAIN EPICYCLOIDAL D'ENGRENAGES MUNI DE DEUX RANGEES DE PIGNONS MONTES SUR AXES FLEXIBLES AVEC COMPENSATION DES DEFORMATIONS DU PORTE-SATELLITES | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 30.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.04.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2009 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | IE | 12.02.2016 | LU | 12.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | FR | 14.03.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.02.2009 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 14.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.02.2009 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 14.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 14.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 14.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 14.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 29.02.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007016336 (TIMKEN CO [US]; FOX GERALD [US]) [Y] 1-19 * pages 3-5 * * figure 2 *; | [YA]US3943787 (HICKS RAYMOND JOHN) [Y] 1-19 * column 2, lines 1-25 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1,12; | [A]DE3701729 (HALBACH & BRAUN IND ANLAGEN [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 2 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE10334824 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,12 * paragraph [0008] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1559928 (NORDEX ENERGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2235448 (FLENDER A F & CO) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007275816 (HENDERSON GEOFFREY MORGAN [NZ]) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0030] * * figures 2-4 * |