EP2254895 - IMIDAZOLE GROUP-CONTAINING PHOSPHORUS COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Peter Mittlerer Rainweg 15 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
HANNO-IGELS, Patrick Kleingemünder Strasse 45 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
BONDAREV, Oleg Bat. 10 C Av. De Général Leclerc F-35042 Rennes / FR | 04 /
JÄKEL, Christoph Haardtstr. 9 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [2010/48] | Application number, filing date | 09709901.4 | 13.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009EP51677 | Priority number, date | EP20080151496 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08151496 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009101162 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254895 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6506, C07F9/6568, C07F9/6571, C07B37/02, C07B53/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07F9/6506 (EP,US);
C07F9/65683 (EP,US);
C07F9/65685 (EP,US);
C07F9/657181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMIDAZOLGRUPPENHALTIGE PHOSPHORVERBINDUNGEN | [2010/48] | English: | IMIDAZOLE GROUP-CONTAINING PHOSPHORUS COMPOUNDS | [2010/48] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PHOSPHORE CONTENANT DES GROUPES IMIDAZOLE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 09.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 09.11.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - NANCHEN, STEVE ET AL, "Chiral phosphino- and (phosphinooxy)-substituted N-heterocyclic carbene ligands and their application in iridium-catalyzed asymmetric hydrogenation", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA , 89(8), 1559-1573 CODEN: HCACAV; ISSN: 0018-019X, (2006), XP002524019 [DA] 1-23 * compounds 7B,C * * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.200690157 | [DY] - FIDDY ET AL, "Comparative Experimental and EXAFS Studies in the Mizoroki-Heck Reaction with Heteroatom-Functionalised N-Heterocyclic Carbene Palladium Catalysts", CHEM. EUR. J., (2007), pages 3652 - 3659, XP002524020 [DY] 1-23 * compounds 4B,C * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CHEM.200601278 | [Y] - IMAMOTO ET AL, "P-Chiral Bis(trialkylphosphine) Ligands and Their Use in Highly Enantioselective Hydrogenation Reactions", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, pages 1635 - 1636, XP002524067 [Y] 1-23 * table 1 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja973423i | [Y] - MAIENZA ET AL, "Exploring Stereogenic Phosphorus: Synthetic Strategies for Diphosphines Containing Bulky, Highly Symmetric Substituents", J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, pages 5239 - 5249, XP002524068 [Y] 1-23 * tables 1,2 * * compounds 8A,13A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JO0201301 |