EP2245490 - STEPPED CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TE Connectivity Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states TE Connectivity Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn PA 19312 / US | ||
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAANE, Laurence, A. 2405 SW Timberline Drive Portland OR 97225 / US | 02 /
SMITS, Matthijs, P. 8423 SE 9th Avenue Portland OR 97202 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
DAANE, Laurence, A. 431 Kemper Crest Drive Newberg OR 97132 / US | ||
02 /
SMITS, Matthijs, P. 8423 SE 9th Avenue Portland OR 97202 / US | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09710050.7 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009US00923 | Priority number, date | US20080028060P | 12.02.2008 Original published format: US 28060 P | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009102472 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245490 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38, H01R24/58, H01R107/00 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
G02B6/3817 (EP,US);
H01R24/58 (EP,US);
G02B6/3801 (EP,US);
G02B6/3809 (EP,US);
H01R2107/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | G02B6/38, H01R24/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | ABGESTUFTER VERBINDER | [2010/44] | English: | STEPPED CONNECTOR | [2010/44] | French: | RACCORD ÉTAGÉ | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 29.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0247874 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPS63301419 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US5574815 (KNEELAND FOSTER C [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US2004253874 (PLISHNER PAUL J [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO2006007421 (SPECTROS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * abstract * | Examination | WO2008118430 | by applicant | WO2006007421 |