EP2242526 - AEROSOL THERAPY DEVICE WITH HIGH FREQUENCY DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immel, Timothy Sean 120 Loma Media Road Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09710824.5 | 13.02.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US34092 | Priority number, date | US20080029224P | 15.02.2008 Original published format: US 29224 P | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009102976 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242526 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M11/02, A61M15/08, // A61M15/00 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
A61M15/08 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP,US);
A61M15/0098 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | A61M11/00, A61M11/02, A61M15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | AEROSOL-THERAPIEVORRICHTUNG MIT HOCHFREQUENZ-ABGABE | [2010/43] | English: | AEROSOL THERAPY DEVICE WITH HIGH FREQUENCY DELIVERY | [2010/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT PAR AÉROSOL À ADMINISTRATION HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 02.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.2012 | 28.02.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6058932 (HUGHES ARTHUR R [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-9 * * column 2, line 11 - line 62 * * column 5, line 63 - column 10, line 3 *; | [X]US2006162722 (BOEHM ANDREAS [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-11 * figures 1, 7 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]US6325475 (HAYES DONALD J [US] ET AL) [X] 12-15 * figures 1-27 * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 13 * * column 7, line 28 - column 10, line 36 *; | [X]US2007202051 (SCHUSCHNIG UWE [DE]) [X] 12-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]EP1818070 (PARI GMBH [DE] PARI PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2007202051 (UWE SCHUSCHNIG); | [X]US2006162722 (ANDREAS BOEHM ET AL.); | [X]US2005244339 (JURGEN JAUERINIG ET AL.); | [A]WO2004050139 (ALEXZA MOLECULAR DELIVERY CORPORATION); | [A]WO9717933 (AEROPAG USA. INC.); | [A]US7225807 (MARK JAMES PAPANIA ET AL.) |