EP2244578 - AGENTS FOR TREATING AND/OR AVOIDING FIRE BLIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Distribution GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [2013/47] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states LANXESS Distribution GmbH Katzbergstrasse 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAALFELD, Frank Kirchberg 30 51515 Kürten-Dürscheid / DE | 02 /
ABELE, Ulf Ortsstrasse 29 86558 Hohenwart / DE | 03 /
SIEBENLIST, Hans St. Kastulusstrasse 7 85301 Schweitenkirchen / DE | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Deblon, Jörg-Stephan LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LEX-IPR Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Deblon, Jörg-Stephan LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP-IPR / Gebäude Q 18 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09710883.1 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009EP51606 | Priority number, date | EP20080151535 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08151535 | EP20080153287 | 26.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08153287 | [2010/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009101122 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2244578 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/06, A01N37/02, A01N37/36, A01P1/00 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
A01N37/02 (EP,US);
A01N59/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/02, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/02, A01N25/02, A01N25/08, A01N37/36 (US,EP);
A01N59/06, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/06, A01N25/02, A01N25/08, A01N37/02, A01N37/36 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER VORBEUGUNG DES FEUERBRANDS | [2010/44] | English: | AGENTS FOR TREATING AND/OR AVOIDING FIRE BLIGHT | [2010/44] | French: | AGENTS POUR TRAITER ET/OU PREVENIR UN FEU BACTERIEN | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1421615 (BASF AG) [A] 1-10 * page 1, lines 18-33 * * example 1 *; | [A]JPS59137384 (KOEI CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US4673687 (THIRUMALACHAR MANDAYAM J [IN], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, column 2, lines 9--21 * * page 3, column 3, lines 14-50 *; | [A]WO9613169 (STOLLER ETS [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, lines 4-8 * * page 4, lines 6-23 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 11; table I *; | [A]WO03020027 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, lines 4-6 * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 28 *; | [Y]WO03088745 (VON KROSIGK JAMES RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 9-11 *; | [X]EP1391155 (VETAGRO S R L [IT]) [X] 3,4 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0073]; example 5 *; | [XP]WO2008037677 (LANXESS DISTRIB GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y] - M. TOSELLI, B. MARANGONI, D. MALAGUTI, G. SORRENTI, C. BAZZI, M. COLLINA, "Use of soil -applied calcium chloride to reduce fire blight and brown spot susceptibility of pear", ACTA HORTICULTURAE, (2004), ISSN 0567-7572, pages 301 - 305, XP002580406 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - BIGGS ALAN R, "Effects of calcium salts on apple bitter rot caused by two Colletotrichum spp", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199911), Database accession no. PREV199900537804, XP002580407 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - PLANT DISEASE, (199911), vol. 83, no. 11, ISSN 0191-2917, pages 1001 - 1005 |