EP2245183 - PSMB10: A DIAGNOSIS MARKER AND THERAPEUTIC TARGET OF CHRONIC REJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states TC LAND Expression 21, rue de la Noue Bras de Fer Bio Ouest Ile de Nantes 44200 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states TC LAND Expression 21, rue de la Noue Bras de Fer Bio Ouest Ile de Nantes 44200 Nantes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROUARD, Sophie Les Vaux F-44240 Suce sur Erdre / FR | 02 /
GIRAL, Magali La Vincendière F-44470 Carquefou / FR | 03 /
SOULILLOU, Jean-Paul 32 ter rue Abbaye F-44000 Nantes / FR | 04 /
JOVANOVIC, Vojislav 36 rue des Landes F-44000 Nantes / FR | 05 /
ASHTON-CHESS, Joanna 59 rue Fontaine de Barbin F-44000 Nantes / FR | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/30] | Faivre Petit, Frédérique, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2010/44] | Warcoin, Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09711003.5 | 10.02.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009EP51511 | Priority number, date | EP20080300084 | 11.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08300084 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009101083 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245183 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | PSMB10: EIN DIAGNOSEMARKER UND THERAPEUTISCHES ZIEL FÜR CHRONISCHE ABSTOSSUNG | [2010/44] | English: | PSMB10: A DIAGNOSIS MARKER AND THERAPEUTIC TARGET OF CHRONIC REJECTION | [2010/44] | French: | PSMB10: MARQUEUR DE DIAGNOSTIC ET CIBLE THÉRAPEUTIQUE DE REJET CHRONIQUE | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 28.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2011 | 29.02.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - DONAUER J ET AL, "EXPRESSION PROFILING ON CHRONICALLY REJECTED TRANSPLANT KIDNEYS", TRANSPLANTATION, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20030815), vol. 76, no. 3, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 539 - 547, XP009045200 [X] 1-4,8,9,11,12 * the whole document * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.TP.0000079459.89608.B7 | [X] - MATEOS-MAZON JUAN ET AL, "Use of bortezomib in the management of chronic graft-versus-host disease among multiple myeloma patients relapsing after allogeneic transplantation", HAEMATOLOGICA, FONDAZIONE FERRATA STORTI, ROME, IT, (20070901), vol. 92, no. 9, ISSN 0390-6078, pages 1295 - 1296, XP009108243 [X] 13,14 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.10820 | [X] - ZWEEGMAN S ET AL, "Immune-modulatory effects of bortezomib in GVHD", LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, CHUR, CH, (20070501), vol. 48, no. 5, ISSN 1042-8194, pages 853 - 854, XP009108242 [X] 13,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10428190701297394 | [X] - TODISCO E ET AL, "Inhibition of chronic graft-vs-host disease with retention of anti-myeloma effects by the proteasome inhibitor bortezomib", LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, CHUR, CH, (20070501), vol. 48, no. 5, ISSN 1042-8194, pages 1015 - 1018, XP009108241 [X] 13,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10428190701253843 | Examination | - FLECHNER S M ET AL, "Kidney transplant rejection and tissue injury by gene profiling of biopsies and peripheral blood lymphocytes", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TRANSPLANTATION, BLACKWELL MUNKSGAARD, DK, (20040901), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:DOI:10.1111/J.1600-6143.2004.00526.X, ISSN 1600-6135, pages 1475 - 1489, XP002322115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-6143.2004.00526.x | by applicant | WO2004071382 | WO2006017981 |